This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2022 at 07:24:10 (UTC).

Arias Ramirez v. Coca Cola Company of North America

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 Arias Ramirez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Coca Cola Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01077

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Arias Ramirez

Aurora, CO 80010

Defendant

Coca Cola Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ava Pfeiffer

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC - St. Louis

600 Washington Avenue, Suite 900

St. Louis, MO 63101

Joseph M. Wientge, Jr.

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC - St. Louis

600 Washington Avenue, Suite 900

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (TMT) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#28

(#28) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. (Wientge, Joseph) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#27

(#27) MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. (Wientge, Joseph) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#24

(#24) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Wientge, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. (Wientge, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#22

RESTRICTED

#20

No Description Available

19 #1

Attachment Dismissal and Notice of Rights

19 #19

Main Document

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

(#26) DOCUMENT REMOVED FOR FILING ERROR; COUNSEL TO REFILE - MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Plaintiff's Complaint) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. (Wientge, Joseph) Modified on 12/2/2022 (TMT). (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 29. Fri Dec 2 14:49:23 CST 2022 (Tillman, Tiffani) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (TMT) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. (Wientge, Joseph) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. (Wientge, Joseph) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DOCUMENT REMOVED FOR FILING ERROR; COUNSEL TO REFILE - MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Plaintiff's Complaint) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. (Wientge, Joseph) Modified on 12/2/2022 (TMT). (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice from Clerk instructing Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/5/2022. (BRP) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #23 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file the response to the Amended Complaint on or before December 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/22/2022. (ESD) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Wientge, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Coca Cola Company of North America. (Wientge, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Juan Arias Ramirez. Coca Cola Company of North America served on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022. (BRP) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Juan Arias Ramirez. (KCD) (Address updated in cm/ecf on 10/13/2022.) (CBL). (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Oct 11 10:01:37 CDT 2022 (admin,) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JKL) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. 1 Summons(es) issued and hand delivered to Plaintiff Juan Arias Ramirez. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JKL) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENTAL- EEOC Right to Sue Letter re #2 Complaint by Plaintiff Juan Arias Ramirez. (JKL) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Juan Arias Ramirez Process Server: Goldkrupp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JKL) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketReceipt: $ 402.00, receipt number 12475 Civil Filing Fee. (JKL) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Juan Arias Ramirez. (JKL) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against defendant Coca Cola Company of North America, Jury Demand, filed by Juan Arias Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Attachment Letter from Harness Law Office, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(JKL) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • Docket(#1) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE COCA-COLA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M. Wientge, Jr.