This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2021 at 09:06:55 (UTC).

Alvaro Arias Del Cid v. Garland et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Alvaro Arias Del Cid filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Garland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claude M. Hilton and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00774

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Alvaro Arias Del Cid

Defendants

Director of EOIR Jean King

Attorney General Merrick Garland

Chief Immigration Ju Tracy Short

BIA Director David H. Wetmore

Field Office Dir. Russell Hott

Merrick Garland

Jean King

Tracy Short

David H. Wetmore

Russell Hott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John William Goodman

Attorney at Murray Osorio PLLC

4103 Chain Bridge Rd, Suite 300

Fairfax, VA 22030

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alvaro Arias Del Cid (Goodman, John) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Alvaro Arias Del Cid NOTICE of progress in immigration case by Alvaro Arias Del Cid (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BIA Decision, #2 Exhibit BIA Filing Receipt for Motion to Reopen, #3 Exhibit Stamped Motion for Subpoena, #4 Exhibit DHS Notice of Non-opposition, #5 Exhibit Petition for Review Case Initiating Document)(Goodman, John) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Arias Del Cid. All Defendants. (Goodman, John) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Russell Hott, Jean King, Tracy Short, David H. Wetmore, and U.S. Attorney NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit) (lber) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Alvaro Arias Del Cid. (Goodman, John) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AVAEDC-7869455.), filed by Alvaro Arias Del Cid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Virginia Judiciary Online Case Information System Printout, #2 Exhibit 2, Immigration Judge Decision, #3 Exhibit 3, Online Detainee Locator System, #4 Exhibit 4,Parole Requests (Oct. 2020 and Jan. 2021), #5 Exhibit 5, Parole Request Denials (Oct. 2020 and Jan. 2021), #6 Exhibit 6, Exh. 6)Requests for Reconsideration of Parole Denials (Feb. 2021 and Mar. 2021), #7 Exhibit 7, Emails with ICE Assistant Field Office Director (Mar. 2021 through May 2021), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, John) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lber) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant