This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 10:46:56 (UTC).

Argyros v. Antelope Point Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Argyros filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Antelope Point Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08109

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Argyros, Jr.

Defendants

Unknown Parties

Antelope Point Holdings LLC

Antelope Point Holdings LLC an Arizona Limited Liability Company doing business as Antelope Point Marina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P Beitchman

Attorney at Beitchman & Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 570

Encino, CA 91436

Paul Tokar

Attorney at Beitchman & Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 570

Encino, CA 91436

Shanks Leonhardt

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Jesse Morgan Showalter

Attorney at Robbins & Curtin PLLC

301 E Bethany Home Rd., Ste. B100

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3312

Defendant Attorneys

Carl F Mariano

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Felice Franco Guerrieri

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) NOTICE re: Non-Parties At Fault by Antelope Point Holdings LLC . (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by George Argyros, Jr. (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#40

(#40) AFFIDAVIT of Brian Olds Service of Subpoena on Golden Gate Petroleum by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#39

(#39) AFFIDAVIT of Nancy Gotay Service of Subpoena on Intertek Testing Services by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#38

(#38) AFFIDAVIT of Henry Flores Service of Subpoena on Intertek Testing Services by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#37

(#37) AFFIDAVIT of Antonio Roque Service of Subpoena on Jacksons Energy by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#36

(#36) AFFIDAVIT of Michael Cryan Service of Subpoena on Diamond Trucking by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#35

(#35) AFFIDAVIT of Bill Bilyk Service of Subpoena on Hallum, Inc. by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

29 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 7/11/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/17/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#7

(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Argyros, Jr: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Antelope Point Holdings, LLC on 04/12/2019. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/2019. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16773333. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8109-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by George Argyros, Jr. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (DLC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16773333 filed by George Argyros, Jr. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE re: Non-Parties At Fault by Antelope Point Holdings LLC . (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by George Argyros, Jr. (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) AFFIDAVIT of Brian Olds Service of Subpoena on Golden Gate Petroleum by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) AFFIDAVIT of Nancy Gotay Service of Subpoena on Intertek Testing Services by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) AFFIDAVIT of Henry Flores Service of Subpoena on Intertek Testing Services by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) AFFIDAVIT of Antonio Roque Service of Subpoena on Jacksons Energy by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) AFFIDAVIT of Michael Cryan Service of Subpoena on Diamond Trucking by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) AFFIDAVIT of Bill Bilyk Service of Subpoena on Hallum, Inc. by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Dispositive motions due by 5/29/2020. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019. ORDERED denying as moot the #29 , #31 , Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Amended Joint Case Management Report filed by Plaintiff George Argyros, Jr. (Tokar, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Argyros, Jr: Certificate of Service re: DKT 6 Court's Order dated April 16, 2019 upon Antelope Point Holdings, LLC on 4/16/2019. (Leonhardt, Shanks) *Modified text on 5/7/2019 (DXD). (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Argyros, Jr: Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference upon Defendant Antelope Point Holdings on 4/19/2019. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 7/11/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/17/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Argyros, Jr: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Antelope Point Holdings, LLC on 04/12/2019. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/2019. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16773333. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8109-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by George Argyros, Jr. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (DLC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16773333 filed by George Argyros, Jr. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P Beitchman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanks Leonhardt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jesse Morgan Showalter