This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 09:18:00 (UTC).

Argonaut Midwest Insurance Company et al v. PHIL THWEATT WRECKER SERVICE, INC et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Argonaut Midwest Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PHIL THWEATT WRECKER SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00598

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Argonaut Midwest Insurance Company

Colony Insurance Company

Defendants

PHIL THWEATT WRECKER SERVICE, INC

AAA Texas, LLC

COURTNEY TRAVIS JONES

RONNIE JONES

DEBBIE JONES

DANNY KRUMNOW

CARMELLA KRUMNOW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Rigney

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi, LLP

2811 Mckinney Av., Suite 250 West

Dallas, TX 75204

Stephen Andrew Melendi

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi, LLP

2811 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16125215). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Colony Insurance Company, Argonaut Midwest Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melendi, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/14/2022) (lad). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Colony Insurance Company, Argonaut Midwest Insurance Company as to COURTNEY TRAVIS JONES. Waiver sent on 6/22/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; DEBBIE JONES. Waiver sent on 6/22/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; RONNIE JONES. Waiver sent on 6/22/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Colony Insurance Company, Argonaut Midwest Insurance Company as to COURTNEY TRAVIS JONES. Waiver sent on 6/22/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; DEBBIE JONES. Waiver sent on 6/22/2022, answer due 8/22/2022; RONNIE JONES. Waiver sent on 6/22/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16125215). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Colony Insurance Company, Argonaut Midwest Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melendi, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/14/2022) (lad). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA Texas, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Rigney