This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2021 at 09:05:54 (UTC).

Argonaut Insurance Company v. Knotel, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Argonaut Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Knotel, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09432

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Argonaut Insurance Company

Defendants

240 W 40 St NYC LLC

303 Second St SF LLC

301 Brannan St SF LLC

Knotel, Inc.

295 Madison NYC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric M. Eusanio

Attorney at Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon, LLP

One Whitehall Street, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Defendant Attorneys

Amelia Hochman

Attorney at Olshan Frome Wolosky LLC

1325 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Lori Marks-Esterman

Attorney at Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP

1325 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#24

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit Demand Letter to Indemnitors 10-13-2020

1 #3

Exhibit Argonaut's Discharge Demand Letter 09-14-2020

1 #2

Exhibit Surety Bonds

1 #1

Exhibit Indemnity Agreement

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 240 W 40 St NYC LLC, 295 Madison NYC LLC, 301 Brannan St SF LLC, 303 Second St SF LLC, Knotel, Inc...(Marks-Esterman, Lori) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. 240 W 40 St NYC LLC answer due 1/8/2021; 295 Madison NYC LLC answer due 1/8/2021; 301 Brannan St SF LLC answer due 1/8/2021; 303 Second St SF LLC answer due 1/8/2021; Knotel, Inc. answer due 1/8/2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Amelia Hochman dated December 8, 2020. Document filed by 240 W 40 St NYC LLC, 295 Madison NYC LLC, 301 Brannan St SF LLC, 303 Second St SF LLC, Knotel, Inc...(Hochman, Amelia) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 301 Brannan St SF LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020; 303 Second St SF LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 240 W 40 St NYC LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020; 295 Madison NYC LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020; Knotel, Inc. served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group US, Inc., Corporate Parent Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Argo Re Ltd., Other Affiliate Argo Financial Holding (Ireland) UC, Other Affiliate Argo Irish Holdings I, Ltd., Other Affiliate Argo Irish Holdings II, Ltd., Other Affiliate Argo Solutions, SA for Argonaut Insurance Company. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Eric M. Eusanio to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 240 W 40 St NYC LLC..(dnh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 303 Second St SF LLC..(dnh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 301 Brannan St SF LLC..(dnh) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric M. Eusanio. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Argonaut Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Eric M. Eusanio. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 240 W 40 St NYC LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 303 Second St SF LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 301 Brannan St SF LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 295 Madison NYC LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Knotel, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group US, Inc., Corporate Parent Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd. for Argonaut Insurance Company. Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company..(Eusanio, Eric) Modified on 11/17/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eusanio, Eric) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 240 W 40 St NYC LLC, 295 Madison NYC LLC, 301 Brannan St SF LLC, 303 Second St SF LLC, Knotel, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22521795)Document filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit Surety Bonds, #3 Exhibit Argonaut's Discharge Demand Letter 09-14-2020, #4 Exhibit Demand Letter to Indemnitors 10-13-2020).(Eusanio, Eric) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNOTEL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant