This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2022 at 10:32:49 (UTC).

Arena IP, LLC v. CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 Arena IP, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CommScope, Inc of North Carolina. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00332

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arena IP, LLC

Defendant

CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P Ramey, III

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Sean Yungwirth

Gilbert A Greene

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit US8320820

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#3

(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE by Arena IP, LLC Request for Summons (Ramey, William) Modified on 8/25/2022 (ch, ). (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arena IP, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arena IP, LLC. CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina served on 8/30/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint re Arena IP, LLC.( Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina.( Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilbert A Greene on behalf of CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/21/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/21/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina to 11/4/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilbert A Greene on behalf of CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina.( Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina to 10/20/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Plaintiff's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint re Arena IP, LLC.( Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arena IP, LLC. CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina served on 8/30/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022

Docket***FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS ARE NOT FILED ON DOCKET FOR ISSUANCE Document # 3, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arena IP, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE by Arena IP, LLC Request for Summons (Ramey, William) Modified on 8/25/2022 (ch, ). (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9090771.), filed by Arena IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit US8320820, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less