This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2021 at 07:17:18 (UTC).

Ardus Medical, LLC v. Ventec Life Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Ardus Medical, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ventec Life Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00553

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ardus Medical, LLC

Defendant

Ventec Life Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher LaRose

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Daniel Richard O'Brien

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorneys

Meghan M. Lamping

Attorney at CARMODY MACDONALD PC - St Louis

120 S. Central Ave., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Benjamin J Razi

Attorney at COVINGTON AND BURLING LLP - DC

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Daniel A. Rios

Attorney at COVINGTON AND BURLING LLP - DC

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Andrew Leff

Attorney at COVINGTON AND BURLING LLP - DC

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

10 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#10

8 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#8

6 #2

Certificate of Good Standing NY Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Certificate of Good Standing DC Certificate of Good Standing

#6

5 #1

Attachment Notice to State Court

#5

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

#3

#2

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all case deadlines are VACATED and all pending motions are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/2/2021. (CLO) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Ardus Medical, LLC (LaRose, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. (Lamping, Meghan) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. (Lamping, Meghan) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel Richard O'Brien for Plaintiff Ardus Medical, LLC. (O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin Razi. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8647426) by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Razi, Benjamin); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/17/2021. (LNJ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin Razi. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8647426) by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Razi, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel Rios. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8646606) by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rios, Daniel); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/14/2021. (LNJ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel Rios. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8646606) by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rios, Daniel) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Leff. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/13/2021. (CLO) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Leff. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8644492) by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing NY Certificate of Good Standing)(Leff, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice to State Court)(Lamping, Meghan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, Jefferson County, Missouri, filed by Ardus Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BAK) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Lamping, Meghan) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Lamping, Meghan) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 21JE-CC00255, with receipt number AMOEDC-8640133, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Ventec Life Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamping, Meghan) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meghan M. Lamping(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin John Razi