This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:08 (UTC).

ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC v. Pund et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pund. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Klindt and Marcia Morales Howard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01411

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James R. Klindt

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC

Defendants

Sean M Ladson

Christopher Ryan Pund

Seascape Ventures, Inc.

Sean M. Ladson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian P. George

Attorney at Akerman LLP

Suite 3100, 50 N. Laura Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3659

Ashlea Ann Edwards

Attorney at Akerman LLP

Suite 3100, 50 N. Laura Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3659

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Seascape Ventures, Inc. (RH) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

9 #1

Composite Exhibit A - Returns of Service

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in support re #4 Order pdf of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC. (George, Christian) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC. (George, Christian) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

5 #2

Consent Letter and Form

5 #1

Case Management Report Form

#5

(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDERED: ARCPE shall have up to and including December 27, 2019, to provide the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/10/2019. (MAM) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sean M Ladson, Christopher Ryan Pund, Seascape Ventures, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16226731) filed by ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(George, Christian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Seascape Ventures, Inc. (RH) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sean M. Ladson (RH) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Sean M. Ladson, Seascape Ventures, Inc. by ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit A - Returns of Service)(Edwards, Ashlea) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE: Upon review of Plaintiff's #7 Memorandum of Law in Support of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, the Court's sua sponte inquiry into its subject matter jurisdiction is satisfied. (MAM) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in support re #4 Order pdf of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC. (George, Christian) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC. (George, Christian) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDERED: ARCPE shall have up to and including December 27, 2019, to provide the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/10/2019. (MAM) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Sean M Ladson, Christopher Ryan Pund, Seascape Ventures, Inc.. (BD) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1411-J-34JRK. (LRB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sean M Ladson, Christopher Ryan Pund, Seascape Ventures, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16226731) filed by ARCPE BAHAMAS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(George, Christian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less