This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 08:02:13 (UTC).

Archon Air Service & Maintenance Corp. et al v. Hudson Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 Archon Air Service Maintenance Corp filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hudson Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Lisette M. Reid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-22828

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Archon Air Service & Maintenance Corp.

Archon Air Management Corp.

Defendants

Hudson Specialty Insurance Company

Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company

People's Insurance Underwriters Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Michael Adelstein

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Steven Fischer

Samantha Samir Rhayem

Mallory Havens Thomas

Erik Crep

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - A copy of all process, pleadings and orders served upon Huds

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Consent to Removal of Defendant Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Mallory Havens Thomas added to party Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Thomas, Mallory) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#4

(#6) NOTICE by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), DEFENDANT, HILLTOP SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY f/k/a HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS MEMORANDU (OF JOINDER) (Thomas, Mallory) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2022

Docket(#21) STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE LISETTE M. REID Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

Docket(#20) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 1/29/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 1/24/2024 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2022., Discovery due by 8/4/2023., Expert Discovery due by 8/4/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 12/19/2022., Mediation Deadline 5/8/2023., In Limine Motions due by 10/19/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2023., Motions due by 9/8/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/18/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/8/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge United States Magistrate Lisette M. Reid for all pretrial non-dispositive and discovery matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 11/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022

Docket(#19) ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Archon Air Management Corp., Archon Air Service & Maintenance Corp.. Replies due by 11/4/2022. (Adelstein, David) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by People's Insurance Underwriters Incorporated. Responses due by 11/8/2022 (Crep, Erik) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2022

Docket(#16) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING)(Rhayem, Samantha) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2022

Docket(#15) STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT, HILLTOP SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY f/k/a HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS REMOVAL STATUS REPORT by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company (Rhayem, Samantha) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022

Docket(#14) NOTICE by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company re #11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -.1Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 2.Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 3.Summons - Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 4.Summons Hudson Specialty Insurance Company, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 5.Summons re: Index #6 Parties: Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company, #6 Exhibit Exhiit F - 6.Summons re: Index #5 -Parties: Hudson Specialty Insurance Company, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - 7.Affidavit of Service Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - 8.Affidavit of Service Hudson Specialty Insurance Company (, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - 9.Summons Peoples Insurance Underwriters Incorporated, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - 10.Summons Re: Index # 13 Parties: Peoples Insurance Underwriters Incorporated, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - 11.Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Rhayem, Samantha) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik Crep on behalf of People's Insurance Underwriters Incorporated. Attorney Erik Crep added to party People's Insurance Underwriters Incorporated(pty:dft). (Crep, Erik) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Compliance by Archon Air Management Corp., Archon Air Service & Maintenance Corp. re #11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Adelstein, David) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/19/2022

Docket(#10) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Archon Air Management Corp., Archon Air Service & Maintenance Corp. (Adelstein, David) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement (DEFENDANT, HILLTOP SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY f/k/a HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT) by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company (Rhayem, Samantha) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to Hilltop Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Hudson Specialty Insurance Company's Memorandum of Law in Support of Notice of Removal and Motion to Dismiss People's Insurance Underwriters Incorpo filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/21/2022. (Rhayem, Samantha) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022

Docket(#7) DEFENDANT ATEGRITY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - policy)(Thomas, Mallory) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), DEFENDANT, HILLTOP SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY f/k/a HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS MEMORANDU (OF JOINDER) (Thomas, Mallory) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022

Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to Hilltop Specialty Insurance Company f/k/a Hudson Specialty Insurance Company's Memorandum of Law in Support of Notice of Removal and Motion to Dismiss People's Insurance Underwriters Incorporated by Archon Air Management Corp., Archon Air Service & Maintenance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Adelstein, David) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), DEFENDANT, HILLTOP SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY f/k/a HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND MOTION TO DISMISS PEOPLES INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INCORPORATED by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/20/2022 (Rhayem, Samantha) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE by Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Consent to Removal of Defendant Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Mallory Havens Thomas added to party Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Thomas, Mallory) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15926371, filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - A copy of all process, pleadings and orders served upon Hudson)(Rhayem, Samantha) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed. Modified Text on 9/6/2022 (swr). (Entered: 09/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less