This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2021 at 09:00:38 (UTC).

Archibald v. Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Archibald filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01104

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malcolm Archibald

Defendants

Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union

Does 1 through 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elaine Kusel

Attorney at McCune Wright Aravelo

One Gateway Center, Suite 2600

Newark, NJ 07102

Richard D. McCune

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

3281 East Guasti Rd., Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Sherief Morsy

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevalo LLP

One Gateway Center, Suite 2600

Newark, NJ 07102

Richard Eugene Hayber

Attorney at Hayber, McKenna & Dinsemore, LLC

750 Main Street, Suite 904

Hartford, CT 06103

Defendant Attorneys

Charles A. Deluca

Attorney at Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford

707 Summer Street

Stamford, CT 06901

Jonathan Zellner

Attorney at Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford

707 Summer Street

Stamford, CT 06901

 

Court Documents

#21

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

8 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard D. McCune

7 #2

Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Elaine S. Kusel

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kusel, Elaine) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union to 10/23/2021. (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 09/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting defendant Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union's motion for extension (Doc. #19 ) to plead. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/1/21. (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 09/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 23, 2021 To Respond to #1 Complaint by Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union. (Zellner, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Zellner on behalf of Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union (Zellner, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Deluca on behalf of Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union (Deluca, Charles) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Sherief Morsy on behalf of Malcolm Archibald (Morsy, Sherief) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. McCune on behalf of Malcolm Archibald (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine Kusel on behalf of Malcolm Archibald (Kusel, Elaine) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malcolm Archibald. Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard D. McCune to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6620100) by Malcolm Archibald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard D. McCune, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Attorney(s) Elaine S. Kusel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6620083) by Malcolm Archibald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Elaine S. Kusel, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Eugene Hayber* *Hayber, McKenna & Dinsemore, LLC* *750 Main Street, Suite 904* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Malcolm Archibald, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2021.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/16/2021.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/16/2021.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2021; Discovery due by 2/15/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2021.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union DOES 1 through 100. (Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nutmeg State Financial Credit Union DOES 1 through 100 ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6612706.), filed by Malcolm Archibald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayber, Richard) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less