This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2020 at 08:24:57 (UTC).

Archambault v. Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan

Case Summary

On 07/18/2020 Archambault filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-30116

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gene Archambault

Defendant

Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George M. Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at The Law Office of George Thompson

Suite 206, 57 East Main St.

Westborough, MA 01581

Defendant Attorneys

David B. Crevier

Attorney at Crevier & Ryan LLP

1500 Main Street, Suite 2316

Springfield, MA 01115-5727

Katherine R. Parsons

Attorney at Crevier & Ryan LLP

1500 Main Street, Suite 2316

Springfield, MA 01115-5727

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R. Parsons on behalf of Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan (Parsons, Katherine) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Crevier on behalf of Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan (Crevier, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8336705 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gene Archambault. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Thompson, George) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R. Parsons on behalf of Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan (Parsons, Katherine) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Crevier on behalf of Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan (Crevier, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bay State Health Group Long Term Disability Plan Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8336705 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gene Archambault. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Thompson, George) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less