Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2019 at 07:27:23 (UTC).

Arch Insurance Company v. Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Arch Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Parsons Transportation Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia L. Cohen and John A. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02718

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Patricia L. Cohen

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arch Insurance Company

Defendant

Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron D. French

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX, P.C.

600 Washington Ave., 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

Kenneth R. Goleaner

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX, P.C.

600 Washington Ave., 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

Meghan E. Lewis

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX, P.C.

4600 Madison Ave., Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

James F. Bennett

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT, LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

Clayton, MO 63105

Arsenio L. Mims

Attorney at DOWD BENNETT, LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1900

Clayton, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. . (French, Aaron) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#19

(#19) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. (French, Aaron) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#18

(#18) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.. Parent companies: Parsons Construction Group, Inc., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: Parsons Corporation,. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Parsons Transportation Group, Inc..(Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

16 #4

4

16 #3

3

16 #2

2

16 #1

1

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Original Filing Form

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Parsons Transportation Group, Inc..(Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. . (French, Aaron) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. (French, Aaron) ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 12/20/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/4/2019. (CLO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. (French, Aaron) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.. Parent companies: Parsons Construction Group, Inc., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: Parsons Corporation,. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Parsons Transportation Group, Inc..(Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4)(Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: This case having been recently reassigned to the undersigned, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for December 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. will now be held in the chambers of the undersigned. (Rule 16 Conference set for 12/12/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/1/19. (JAB) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings (AFC) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/5/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/12/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/12/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 10/22/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Arsenio L. Mims for Defendant Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.. (Mims, Arsenio) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendant Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Arch Insurance Company. Parsons Transportation Group, Inc. served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Lewis, Meghan) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Kenneth R. Goleaner for Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. (Goleaner, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. Parent companies: Arch Reinsurance Company, Arch Capital Group Ltd.,. (French, Aaron) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Meghan E. Lewis for Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company. (Lewis, Meghan) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Aaron D. French. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Arch Insurance Company Process Server: Robert H. Pedroli, III, Eastern Missouri Legal Services (French, Aaron) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Parsons Transportation Group, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7505484, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form, #8 Summons)(French, Aaron) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron D. French

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meghan E. Lewis