This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2021 at 08:49:45 (UTC).

ARC Medical Design Limited et al v. Medivators Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 ARC Medical Design Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Medivators Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00929

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED

KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED

Defendants

CANTEL MEDICAL CORP.

MEDIVATORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Robert Rueckheim

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

Suite 205, 275 Middlefield Road, Ste 205, Menlo Park

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Lawrence Slusky

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1901 L Street N W

Washington, DC 20036

James Winn

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Katherine Kelly Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle Edward Friesen

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

600 Travis Street, Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Sharon Audrey Israel

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

600 Travis Street, Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

John D. Garretson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2555 Grand Blvd

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

28 #10

Exhibit 10

28 #9

Exhibit 9

28 #8

Exhibit 8

28 #7

Exhibit 7

28 #6

Exhibit 6

28 #5

Exhibit 5

28 #4

Exhibit 4

28 #3

Exhibit 3

24 #10

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to CANTEL MEDICAL CORP., filed.(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to MEDIVATORS INC., filed.(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B1

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Israel, Sharon) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition to #24 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings, filed by ARC Medical Design Limited, KeyMed (Medical and Industrial Equipment) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Proposed Order)(Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle E. Friesen on behalf of Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. (Friesen, Kyle) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for John D. Garretson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for John D. Garretson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2021. (Israel, Sharon) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order)(Israel, Sharon) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed.(Israel, Sharon) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 4/28/2021.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed.(Israel, Sharon) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Lawrence Slusky to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Israel, Sharon) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docket(#9) *** DOCKETED IN ERROR US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) Modified on 3/23/2021 (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to CANTEL MEDICAL CORP., MEDIVATORS INC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE re Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED, KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED, filed. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Rueckheim on behalf of ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED, KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED, filed. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED, KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED, filed.(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to CANTEL MEDICAL CORP., filed.(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to MEDIVATORS INC., filed.(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26148389) filed by ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED, KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANTEL MEDICAL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Winn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Vidal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R. Rueckheim