This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 08:46:00 (UTC).

ARC HOME LOAN LLC v. MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 ARC HOME LOAN LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Karen M. Williams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06849

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARC HOME LOAN LLC

WEI MORTGAGE LLC

Defendant

MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY L. COHEN

Attorney at Royer Cooper Cohen Braunfeld LLC

101 West Elm Street, Suite 220

Conshohocken, PA 19428

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by ARC HOME LOAN LLC (bf, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#6

(#6) Letter re settlement from BARRY L. COHEN. (rss, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARC HOME LOAN LLC. MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARC HOME LOAN LLC F/K/A WEI MORTGAGE LLC identifying AG AH LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Exhibit to #1 Complaint by ARC HOME LOAN LLC F/K/A WEI MORTGAGE LLC. (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10901318), filed by ARC HOME LOAN LLC F/K/A WEI MORTGAGE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by ARC HOME LOAN LLC (bf, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter re settlement from BARRY L. COHEN. (rss, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARC HOME LOAN LLC. MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARC HOME LOAN LLC F/K/A WEI MORTGAGE LLC identifying AG AH LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Exhibit to #1 Complaint by ARC HOME LOAN LLC F/K/A WEI MORTGAGE LLC. (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10901318), filed by ARC HOME LOAN LLC F/K/A WEI MORTGAGE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEI MORTGAGE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARC HOME LOANS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry L Cohen