This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:11:49 (UTC).

Arbutus Biopharma Corporation et al v. Moderna, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Arbutus Biopharma Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Moderna, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00252

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arbutus Biopharma Corporation

Genevant Sciences GmbH

Defendants

Moderna, Inc.

ModernaTX, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John W. Shaw

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

I.M. Pei Building, 1105 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Adam D. Harber

Daralyn J. Durie

David I. Berl

Denis R Hurley

Eric C. Wiener

Jessica Palmer Ryen

Lydia B Cash

Thomas S. Fletcher

Defendant Attorneys

Brian P. Egan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam D. Harber - filed by Arbutus Biopharma Corporation, Genevant Sciences GmbH. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie and Eric C. Wiener - filed by Arbutus Biopharma Corporation, Genevant Sciences GmbH. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David I. Berl, Thomas S. Fletcher, Jessica Palmer Ryen, Denis R. Hurley and Lydia B. Cash - filed by Arbutus Biopharma Corporation, Genevant Sciences GmbH. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 6, 2022 - filed by Moderna, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#9

SO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Patricia A. Carson, Jeanna M. Wacker and Mark C. McLennan filed by Moderna, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/3/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Moderna, Inc. on 2/28/2022; ModernaTX, Inc. on 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Modernatx)(mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Roivant Sciences Ltd. for Genevant Sciences GmbH. Roivant Sciences Ltd., a publicly-held company, owns 10% or more of the stock of Arbutus Biopharma Corp. - filed by Arbutus Biopharma Corporation and Genevant Sciences GmbH. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 11,141,378 B2. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,058,069 B2 ;US 8,492,359 B2 ;US 8,822,668 B2 ;US 9,364,435 B2 ;US 9,504,651 B2. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Moderna, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3812080.) - filed by Genevant Sciences GmbH, Arbutus Biopharma Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

9 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Adam D. Harber for Genevant Sciences GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam D. Harber filed by Genevant Sciences GmbH, Arbutus Biopharma Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/18/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam D. Harber - filed by Arbutus Biopharma Corporation, Genevant Sciences GmbH. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney David I. Berl, Thomas S. Fletcher, Denis R Hurley, Jessica Palmer Ryen, Lydia B Cash, Daralyn J. Durie, and Eric C. Wiener for Genevant Sciences GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie and Eric C. Wiener, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David I. Berl, Thomas S. Fletcher, Jessica Palmer Ryen, Denis R. Hurley and Lydia B. Cash filed by Genevant Sciences GmbH, Arbutus Biopharma Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/15/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie and Eric C. Wiener - filed by Arbutus Biopharma Corporation, Genevant Sciences GmbH. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David I. Berl, Thomas S. Fletcher, Jessica Palmer Ryen, Denis R. Hurley and Lydia B. Cash - filed by Arbutus Biopharma Corporation, Genevant Sciences GmbH. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 6, 2022 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Moderna, Inc. answer due 5/6/2022; ModernaTX, Inc. answer due 5/6/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/7/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 6, 2022 - filed by Moderna, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Patricia A. Carson, Jeanna M. Wacker and Mark C. McLennan filed by Moderna, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/3/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Hurst, Patricia A. Carson, Jeanna M. Wacker and Mark C. McLennan - filed by Moderna, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genevant Sciences GmbH, Arbutus Biopharma Corporation. ModernaTX, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Shaw, John) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genevant Sciences GmbH, Arbutus Biopharma Corporation. Moderna, Inc. served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Shaw, John) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Moderna, Inc. on 2/28/2022; ModernaTX, Inc. on 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Modernatx)(mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Roivant Sciences Ltd. for Genevant Sciences GmbH. Roivant Sciences Ltd., a publicly-held company, owns 10% or more of the stock of Arbutus Biopharma Corp. - filed by Arbutus Biopharma Corporation and Genevant Sciences GmbH. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 11,141,378 B2. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,058,069 B2 ;US 8,492,359 B2 ;US 8,822,668 B2 ;US 9,364,435 B2 ;US 9,504,651 B2. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Moderna, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3812080.) - filed by Genevant Sciences GmbH, Arbutus Biopharma Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P. Egan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack B. Blumenfeld