This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 08:22:48 (UTC).

ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC et al v. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Ann Marie Donio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02323

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Comar LLC

COMAR, LLC

Defendants

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARNOLD B. CALMANN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comar LLC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#5

(#5) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (bda) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bda) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., COMAR, LLC (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE) (Entered: 05/01/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, COMAR, LLC, AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC waiver sent on 5/10/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, COMAR, LLC, AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC waiver sent on 5/10/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., COMAR, LLC (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE) (Entered: 05/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bda) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (bda) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (bda) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (bda) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketJudge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comar LLC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-13355009) , Related Case Selected, filed by ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, Comar LLC, AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARBOR PHARMACEUTICALS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMAR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC is a litigant