This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 07:30:16 (UTC).

Arbella Mutual Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Arbella Mutual Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-NuTone LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rya W. Zobel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10078

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rya W. Zobel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arbella Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant

Broan-NuTone LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick J. Loftus, III

Attorney at Loftus & LoftusPC

The Coyne Building, 732 East Broadway

South Boston, MA 02124

Erick J. Kirker

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher A. Duggan

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

Andrew D. Black

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP.

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Ex 1

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Civil Action Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-NuTone LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC.. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Broan-NuTone LLC.(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Black on behalf of Broan-NuTone LLC (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT Record. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Affidavit

8 #2

Certificate of Good standing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Erick J. Kirker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erick Kirker Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9232603 by Arbella Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good standing)(Loftus, Patrick) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT Record. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Black on behalf of Broan-NuTone LLC (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Broan-NuTone LLC.(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-NuTone LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC.. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broan-NuTone LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9146226 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arbella Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D. Black

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Duggan