This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 10:22:20 (UTC).

Arban v. The Cellular Connection, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Arban filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Cellular Connection, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Taylor B. McNeel and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Taylor B. McNeel

Referral Judge

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Scott Arban

Defendant

The Cellular Connection, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel M. Waide

Attorney at JOHNSON, RATLIFF & WAIDE, PLLC

P. O. Box 177381300 Hardy Street, 2Nd Floor (39401)

Hattiesburg, MS 39404

Defendant Attorney

Hal D. Ungar

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, P.C.- New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 3500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-Certified State Court Record

1 #2

Exhibit B-Notice to the Court and All Parties of Removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by The Cellular Connection, LLC.(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2021 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Michael Scott Arban (Waide, Daniel) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#6

(#6) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a four-week term of Court beginning on 10/31/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19-20/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Discovery due by 5/3/2022. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2022. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2022. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/1/2022. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/1/2022. Motions due by 5/17/2022. Settlement Conference set for 8/25/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 10/12/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2022. EDT: 4 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 12/1/2021 (SR) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Michael Scott Arban (Waide, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Michael Scott Arban (Waide, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Michael Scott Arban (Waide, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Michael Scott Arban (Waide, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a four-week term of Court beginning on 10/31/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19-20/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Taylor B. McNeel. Discovery due by 5/3/2022. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2022. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2022. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/1/2022. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/1/2022. Motions due by 5/17/2022. Settlement Conference set for 8/25/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 683 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. ADR Report due by 10/12/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2022. EDT: 4 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 12/1/2021 (SR) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/1/2021 with attorneys Daniel M. Waide and Hal D. Ungar. (SR) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 5. Incorrect division listed on this pleading. The correct division is Southern. Also, the Plaintiff is named as Michael Scott Arban and should be listed as such in the style and throughout every pleading filed with the court. (JCH) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Michael Scott Arban (Waide, Daniel) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2021 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Incorrect event chosen. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event code Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) should have been used. Attorney is not required to refile. (RLW) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: (1) Advising attorney that the judges' initials (TBM-RPM) should be included after the case number and not their names; and (2) Wrong event code chosen. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) should have been used. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by The Cellular Connection, LLC.(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cellular Connection, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Round Room Holdings, Inc. for The Cellular Connection, LLC. (Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cellular Connection, LLC from Circuit Court of George County, Mississippi, case number 21-CK-199(2). ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 4678976) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-Notice to the Court and All Parties of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hal D Ungar