This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 01:41:36 (UTC).

Aranda et al v. Sweeney et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Aranda filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Sweeney. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall J. Newman and John A. Mendez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00613

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla

Marie Diane Aranda

Defendants

Tara Katuk Mac Lean Sweeney

United States Bureau Of Indian Affairs

Tory Burdick

Carol Rogers Davis

Amy Dutschke

Intervenor Defendants

Michael Mendibles

Antoinette Lopez

California Valley Miwok Tribe Tribal Council

Gilbert Ramirez, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Frederick Gede

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, Po Box 944255

San Francisco, CA 94111

Colin West

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1596

Defendant Attorney

Devon Lehman McCune

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

999 18Th St., South Terrace, Suite 370

Denver, CO 80202

Intervenor Defendant Attorney

James Franklin Rusk

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin, LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, 17Th Floor

San Franciso, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#15) NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(West, Colin) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition to Intervention

#14

(#14) OPPOSITION by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla to #7 Motion to intervene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A )(West, Colin) Modified on 6/5/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/19 GRANTING #9 Request to Seal Documents. (Huang, H) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

11 #5

Exhibit E

11 #4

Exhibit D

11 #1

Exhibit A

10 #6

Proof of Service

10 #5

Proposed Order

10 #4

Declaration of Chadd Everone

10 #3

Declaration of Yolanda Lisa Fontanilla

#10

(#10) MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Marie Diane Aranda, #3 Declaration of Yolanda Lisa Fontanilla, #4 Declaration of Chadd Everone, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Proof of Service) (West, Colin) Modified on 5/22/2019 (York, M). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla. (West, Colin) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Declaration of James Rusk

#7

(#7) MOTION to INTERVENE by Intervenor-Defendants. Attorney Rusk, James Franklin added. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Rusk, #2 Proposed Order)(Rusk, James) Modified on 4/30/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. CASE CLOSED.(Kaminski, H) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(West, Colin) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) OPPOSITION by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla to #7 Motion to intervene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A )(West, Colin) Modified on 6/5/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SEALED EVENT. (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (Huang, H) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/19 GRANTING #9 Request to Seal Documents. (Huang, H) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECLARATION of Professor Stephen Dow Beckham in SUPPORT of #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (West, Colin) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Marie Diane Aranda, #3 Declaration of Yolanda Lisa Fontanilla, #4 Declaration of Chadd Everone, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Proof of Service) (West, Colin) Modified on 5/22/2019 (York, M). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla. (West, Colin) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla re #1 Complaint. (West, Colin) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to INTERVENE by Intervenor-Defendants. Attorney Rusk, James Franklin added. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Rusk, #2 Proposed Order)(Rusk, James) Modified on 4/30/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/15/2019 DENYING plaintiffs' #4 Motion for TRO. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Briefing on #4 Motion for TRO. Attorney McCune, Devon Lehman added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCune, Devon) Modified on 4/15/2019 (Coll, A). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Marie Diane Aranda, Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla. (Attachments: #1 TRO Checklist, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration Everone, #4 Declaration Lewis, #5 Proposed Order)(West, Colin) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tory Burdick, Carol Rogers Davis, Amy Dutschke, Tara Katuk Mac Lean Sweeney, United States Bureau Of Indian Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Colin C. West* *MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP* *One Market, Spear Street Tower* *San Francisco, CA 94105*. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Yolanda Lisa Fontinalla, Marie Diane Aranda. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8204208) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(West, Colin) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Valley Miwok Tribe is a litigant