This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 09:35:52 (UTC).

Aranda et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Aranda filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04209

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blair Aranda

Gregorio Aranda

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura R. Garrett

Attorney at Social Media Victims Law Center

1390 Market St, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 98104

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survivorship against Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17365868.). Filed byBlair Aranda, BLAIR ARANDA as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brantley Aranda, GREGORIO ARANDA. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by GREGORIO ARANDA, BLAIR ARANDA as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brantley Aranda, Blair Aranda Civil Cover Sheet. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Blair Aranda, Blair Aranda, Gregorio Aranda . (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Blair Aranda, Blair Aranda, Gregorio Aranda.. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/26/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blair Aranda, Blair Aranda, Gregorio Aranda. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/28/2022) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the to the Northern District of Illinois or the Western District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. These documents are submitted to this court pursuant to JPML Rule 6.2 for informational purposes. The JPML will review the Motion for Transfer to determine whether to consolidate or coordinate the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the to the Northern District of Illinois or the Western District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. These documents are submitted to this court pursuant to JPML Rule 6.2 for informational purposes. The JPML will review the Motion for Transfer to determine whether to consolidate or coordinate the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docket(#13) ORDER. In light of the JPML proceedings, MDL No. 3047, the case is stayed pending further order. The case management conference set for October 27, 2022, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/2/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blair Aranda, Blair Aranda, Gregorio Aranda. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/28/2022) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/26/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Blair Aranda, Blair Aranda, Gregorio Aranda.. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Parties' names should not be entered in capitalized letters. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, fi led by Blair Aranda, Gregorio Aranda. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Blair Aranda, Blair Aranda, Gregorio Aranda . (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assi gnment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Please re-file civil cover sheet in its entirety Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by GREGORIO ARANDA, Blair Aranda, BLAIR ARANDA as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brantley Aranda. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by GREGORIO ARANDA, BLAIR ARANDA as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brantley Aranda, Blair Aranda Civil Cover Sheet. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survivorship against Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17365868.). Filed byBlair Aranda, BLAIR ARANDA as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Brantley Aranda, GREGORIO ARANDA. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura R. Garrett