This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2019 at 07:32:02 (UTC).

Arambula v. B&E Karing Hands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Arambula filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against B E Karing Hands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephan M. Vidmar, Gregory J. Fouratt and William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

Presiding Judges

Gregory J. Fouratt

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eustolia Arambula

Defendants

B&E Karing Hands, Inc.

Emma Sanchez

Irma Sanchez

Karing Hands

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Charles Benoit

Attorney at Texas Rio Grande Legal Aid, Inc.

1331 Texas Avenue

El Paso, TX 79901

Defendant Attorneys

Steven E. Jones

Attorney at Carrillo Law Firm, P.C.

P.O. Box 457

Las Cruces, NM 88004

Raul A. Carrillo, Jr.

Attorney at Carrillo Law Firm PC

Po Box 457

Las Cruces, NM 88004

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by March 21, 2019. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/28/2019. (jcm) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for January 25, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by B&E Karing Hands, Inc. of Second Rule 68 Offer of Judgment (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Opposed MOTION Conditional Collective Action Certification filed by B&E Karing Hands, Inc., Emma Sanchez. (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Opposed MOTION Conditional Collective Action Certification by B&E Karing Hands, Inc.. (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by B&E Karing Hands, Inc. of Service of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by February 28, 2019 . The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (sju) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit 1-3

#10

(#10) Opposed MOTION Conditional Collective Action Certification by Eustolia Arambula. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3) (Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on February 7, 2019. (Recording Info: LCR Picacho) (jcm) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (arn). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by B&E Karing Hands, Inc. OF NON-AVAILABILITY (Carrillo, Raul) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by B&E Karing Hands, Inc.. (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by B&E Karing Hands, Inc. of Consent to Removal (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Notice of Filing

1 #1

Exhibit 1-State District Court Proceedings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from State of New Mexico Third Judicial District, case number D-307-CV-2018-02662. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State District Court Proceedings, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit 3-Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE by B&E Karing Hands, Inc. of Second Rule 68 Offer of Judgment (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • (#17) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 14. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Opposed MOTION Conditional Collective Action Certification filed by B&E Karing Hands, Inc., Emma Sanchez. (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • (#15) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Opposed MOTION Conditional Collective Action Certification by B&E Karing Hands, Inc.. (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by B&E Karing Hands, Inc. of Service of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by February 28, 2019 . The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (sju) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Opposed MOTION Conditional Collective Action Certification by Eustolia Arambula. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3) (Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by March 21, 2019. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for April 11, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/28/2019. (jcm) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on February 7, 2019. (Recording Info: LCR Picacho) (jcm) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (arn). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by B&E Karing Hands, Inc. OF NON-AVAILABILITY (Carrillo, Raul) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING and RESETTING a telephonic Status Conference. The telephonic Status Conference currently scheduled for January 25, 2019, is hereby VACATED and RESET for February 7, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jcm) Modified on 1/18/2019 (rh). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for January 25, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by B&E Karing Hands, Inc.. (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6219727 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Emma Sanchez, B&E Karing Hands, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jones, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by B&E Karing Hands, Inc. of Consent to Removal (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (ln) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from State of New Mexico Third Judicial District, case number D-307-CV-2018-02662. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State District Court Proceedings, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit 3-Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.