This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2020 at 09:09:41 (UTC).

A.R. v. Icker et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 A R filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Icker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher C. Conner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01799

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.R.

Defendants

Jessup Borough

Mark Icker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arianne N. Slocum

Attorney at The Slocum Firm, P.C.

600 Jefferson Avenue

Scranton, PA 18510

Matthew Slocum

Attorney at The Slocum Firm, P.C.

410 Spruce Street, Suite 302

Scranton, PA 18503

Defendant Attorney

Mark Joseph Kozlowski

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

P.O. Box 3118

Scranton, PA 18505-3118

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Mark Icker on 10/31/2020, filed by A.R.. (Slocum, Arianne) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jessup Borough. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Kozlowski on behalf of Jessup Borough. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jessup Borough. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.R.. Jessup Borough served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Slocum, Arianne) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/5/2020. (ve) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Mark Icker, Jessup Borough and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Icker, Jessup Borough ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5280526), filed by A.R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Mark Icker on 10/31/2020, filed by A.R.. (Slocum, Arianne) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jessup Borough. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Kozlowski on behalf of Jessup Borough. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jessup Borough. (Kozlowski, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.R.. Jessup Borough served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Slocum, Arianne) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/5/2020. (ve) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Mark Icker, Jessup Borough and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Icker, Jessup Borough ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5280526), filed by A.R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.R. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW SLOCUM(Designation Retained)