This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:39:52 (UTC).

Aquino et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Aquino filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Lawrence King and Melissa Damian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20071

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

Referral Judge

Melissa Damian

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maria Aquino

Jose Aquino

Maria T. Aquino

Jose U. Aquino

Defendant

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

4830 West Kennedy Blvd., Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aristides Juan Diaz

Attorney at Larsen & Associates, P.L.

300 S. Orange Avenue, Suite 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Melissa Mackay Burghardt

Attorney at Clausen Miller P.C.

4830 West Kennedy Blvdsuite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

Michael Hathaway Scott

1645 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd. Suite 300

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1-7

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Burghardt, Melissa) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 2/1/2023., Motions due by 2/6/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/31/2023., Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 6/15/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 2/1/2023., Motions due by 2/6/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/31/2023., Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 6/15/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Burghardt, Melissa) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15297432, filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burghardt, Melissa) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant