Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:24:04 (UTC).

Aquarian Foundation v. Lowndes et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 Aquarian Foundation filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Lowndes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01879

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aquarian Foundation

Defendants

Bruce Kimberly Lowndes

Philosophy Research Center

John/Jane Doe #1-10

Sankacharya Sunkara

Mark Lowndes

Cheri Lowndes

www.higherspritualism.org

Margaret Kvesic

Allen M Jenne

Matthew Lowndes

Daryl Wardenaar

vk.com

Ann Swerman Born

vimeo.com

www.pr.org.au

Anne S Jenne

www.hispirit.org

Lynea S Weatherly

HigherSpiritualism

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jean M. Schiedler-Brown

Attorney at JEAN SCHIEDLER-BROWN & ASSOCIATES

606 Post Ave, Ste 101

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorney

William Walter Spencer

Attorney at MURRAY DUNHAM & MURRAY

Po Box 9844, 100 W Harrison, North Tower Ste 340

Seattle, WA 98109-0844

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Walter Spencer on behalf of Defendant Anne S Jenne. (Spencer, William) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Walter Spencer on behalf of Defendant Allen M Jenne. (Spencer, William) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Extension of Time. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/8/2020, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#12

(#12) PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe to attach signed declaration) re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time for initial disclosures, joint status report, and early settlement by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit Declaration

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time for initial disclosures, joint status report, and early settlement, filed by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/3/2020, (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/10/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/17/2020, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aquarian Foundation (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation. (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER re Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to serve a copy of all filings in this case on all named Defendants, including this Order, by no later than noon on Friday, November 22, 2019, and to provide the Court with proof of service no later than 3 p.m. that same day. The Court will extend the deadlines for Defendants to file notices of intent to respond and to respond. Defendants shall have until noon on November 25, 2019, to file notices and until noon on November 26, 2019, to file responses, if any. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit Declaration of Jean Schiedler-Brown and exhibits 1--4

2 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Reverend Jannifer Werner, TRO, and exhibits

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation The. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Reverend Jannifer Werner, TRO, and exhibits, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jean Schiedler-Brown and exhibits 1--4) Noting Date 11/19/2019, (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #8

Summons Allen Jenne

1 #6

Summons Calavera Productions

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6017169) Attorney Jean M. Schiedler-Brown added to party Aquarian Foundation The(pty:pla), filed by Aquarian Foundation The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121) Schedule A, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120) Schedule B, #4 Supplement Unpublished trade secrets,C, #5 Summons Kvesic, dba Calavera Productions, #6 Summons Calavera Productions, #7 Summons Wardenaar, dba DPWTECH, #8 Summons Allen Jenne, #9 Summons Anne Jenne, #10 Summons Lowndes, Bruce;aka's, dba,/resdential address, #11 Summons Lowndes,Bruce;aka's,dba,business address, #12 Summons Cheri Lowndes, #13 Summons Lowndes,Jane Doe, wife of Mark, #14 Summons Lowndes, Mark, #15 Summons Lowndes, Jane D, wife of Matthew, #16 Summons Lowndes, Matthew, #17 Summons Weatherly, Lynea)(Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Walter Spencer on behalf of Defendant Anne S Jenne. (Spencer, William) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Walter Spencer on behalf of Defendant Allen M Jenne. (Spencer, William) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Extension of Time. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/8/2020, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe to attach signed declaration) re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time for initial disclosures, joint status report, and early settlement by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #11 -1 Declaration of Jean Schiedler-Brown re: Motion for Extension of Time, was improperly signed by Jean Schiedler-Brown. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (PM) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time for initial disclosures, joint status report, and early settlement, filed by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/3/2020, (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/10/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/17/2020, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aquarian Foundation (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation. (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER re Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to serve a copy of all filings in this case on all named Defendants, including this Order, by no later than noon on Friday, November 22, 2019, and to provide the Court with proof of service no later than 3 p.m. that same day. The Court will extend the deadlines for Defendants to file notices of intent to respond and to respond. Defendants shall have until noon on November 25, 2019, to file notices and until noon on November 26, 2019, to file responses, if any. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Allen M Jenne, Anne S Jenne, Margaret Kvesic, Bruce Kimberly Lowndes, Cheri Lowndes, Jane Doe Lowndes(his wife), Mark Lowndes, Matthew Lowndes, Daryl Wardenaar, and Lynea S Weatherly. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(GT) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/20/2019) (GT). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Aquarian Foundation must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/26/2019. (GT) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GT) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (GT) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation The. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Reverend Jannifer Werner, TRO, and exhibits, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jean Schiedler-Brown and exhibits 1--4) Noting Date 11/19/2019, (Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6017169) Attorney Jean M. Schiedler-Brown added to party Aquarian Foundation The(pty:pla), filed by Aquarian Foundation The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121) Schedule A, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120) Schedule B, #4 Supplement Unpublished trade secrets,C, #5 Summons Kvesic, dba Calavera Productions, #6 Summons Calavera Productions, #7 Summons Wardenaar, dba DPWTECH, #8 Summons Allen Jenne, #9 Summons Anne Jenne, #10 Summons Lowndes, Bruce;aka's, dba,/resdential address, #11 Summons Lowndes,Bruce;aka's,dba,business address, #12 Summons Cheri Lowndes, #13 Summons Lowndes,Jane Doe, wife of Mark, #14 Summons Lowndes, Mark, #15 Summons Lowndes, Jane D, wife of Matthew, #16 Summons Lowndes, Matthew, #17 Summons Weatherly, Lynea)(Schiedler-Brown, Jean) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIMEO, INC. is a litigant