This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2022 at 08:42:49 (UTC).

Aqua Pulsar, LLC v. Beaver Ecoworks, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Aqua Pulsar, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Beaver Ecoworks, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald M. Middlebrooks and Shaniek M. Maynard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-14238

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

Referral Judge

Shaniek M. Maynard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aqua Pulsar, LLC

Defendants

Beaver Ecoworks, LLC

AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc.

Sanjeev Jakhete

Shalini Jakhete

Linda Bisbee

Jamil Mikati

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Maurice Mullins

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131-2847

Ana Maria Barton

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33131

Wesley Andrew Butensky

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

John Francis Bradley

Attorney at Bradley Legal Group, P.A.

1217 East Broward Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

19 #19

Main Document

17 #1

Exhibit

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Ana Maria Barton (Barton, Ana) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibits

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 5/3/2023 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Settlement. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/15/2022)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (swr) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

1 #7

Summon(s) Aquagen Engineering Services, Inc.

1 #6

Summon(s) Jamil Mikati

1 #5

Summon(s) Linda Bisbee

1 #4

Summon(s) Shalini Jakhete

1 #3

Summon(s) Sanjeev Jakhete

1 #2

Summon(s) Beaver Ecoworks, LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Aqua Pulsar, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barton, Ana) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #17 the Parties' Joint Motion to Change Trial Date. The Parties request that I continue the trial date in this matter from May 2023 to November 2023. As support for this broad relief, they cite only the "complex issues involved in this case, the realistic timeframes for discovery and pretrial motions, and the number of Parties involved." "A continuance of any trial... will be granted only on exceptional circumstances." S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.6. The Parties' vague references to the complexity of this case and the number of Parties do not constitute exceptional circumstances, nor do they establish good cause for the continuance requested. Moreover, I am not persuaded that there are any obstacles that will prevent the Parties from litigating this case during the trial period I have set, and the Parties have not pointed to any such obstacle. Accordingly, the Parties' Joint Motion (DE #17 ) is denied. The Parties are reminded that if they desire more flexibility in the Pretrial Schedule, they may consent to magistrate jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/23/2022. (jnk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Change Trial Date re #13 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, by Aqua Pulsar, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barton, Ana) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Ana Maria Barton (Barton, Ana) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Docket(#15) PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for TUESDAY, AUGUST 30, 2022, at 10:30 A.M. in Fort Pierce Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. To participate, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 5312437. Counsel shall confer and file, by THURSDAY, AUGUST 25, 2022, a Joint Scheduling Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.1.B. To the extent a Joint Scheduling Report has previously been filed, the parties shall file an amended version based on the existing trial date. The parties shall also begin pretrial tasks now, in advance of the Conference. This includes the exchange of initial disclosures and the start of discovery coordination. This is necessary so that the parties can complete all pretrial tasks within the time allotted and have the case ready for trial by the existing trial date. The parties must be prepared for the Conference at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their Conference begins, as the Court sets multiple cases for the same time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/17/2022. (jrz) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 8/29/2022) by AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, Shalini Jakhete, Jamil Mikati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Bradley, John) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 5/3/2023 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Settlement. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketReset Response/Answer Due Deadline: AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc. response/answer due 8/16/2022; Beaver Ecoworks, LLC response/answer due 8/16/2022; Linda Bisbee response/answer due 8/16/2022; Sanjeev Jakhete response/answer due 8/16/2022; Shalini Jakhete response/answer due 8/16/2022; Jamil Mikati response/answer due 8/16/2022. PER DE# 12 (cds) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is August 5, 2022. (DE 7 ). Defendants seek a second extension of this deadline, citing that the pleadings in a related case, which have not yet been submitted, will be relevant and referenced in their response. Based on the representations contained in Defendants' Motion, I find good cause to grant the relief requested. Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to August 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/4/2022. (jnk) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time time to respond re #1 Complaint, by AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, Shalini Jakhete, Jamil Mikati. Responses due by 8/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, John) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beaver Ecoworks, LLC (Bradley, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc. (Bradley, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aqua Pulsar, LLC (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is July 22, 2022. They seek an extension of this deadline until August 5, 2022, citing that their response will depend on Plaintiff's response to Defendant Sanjeev Jakhete's Complaint in a related action, Case No. 22-cv-14158-KMM. Because the relief requested is brief and unopposed, I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to August 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/19/2022. (jnk) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's Notice to Filer re #5 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, Shalini Jakhete, Jamil Mikati. Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Beaver Ecoworks, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Linda Bisbee(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Sanjeev Jakhete(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Shalini Jakhete(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Jamil Mikati(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, John) Modified Relief on 7/19/2022 (ls). (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, Shalini Jakhete, Jamil Mikati. (swr) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (swr) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15754745, filed by Aqua Pulsar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, #3 Summon(s) Sanjeev Jakhete, #4 Summon(s) Shalini Jakhete, #5 Summon(s) Linda Bisbee, #6 Summon(s) Jamil Mikati, #7 Summon(s) Aquagen Engineering Services, Inc.)(Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less