This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 12:16:45 (UTC).

Apuzzo v. Swope

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Apuzzo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Swope. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Kato Crews and Philip A. Brimmer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03377

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

S. Kato Crews

Philip A. Brimmer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Apuzzo

Defendant

Roddy Swope

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Hart

Tenge Law Firm Llc, 2521 Broadway Street, Suite A

Boulder, CO 80304

James T. Tenge

Tenge Law Firm Llc, 2521 Broadway Street, Suite A

Boulder, CO 80304

Defendant Attorney

Deana R. Dagner

Attorney at Dagner Schluter Mitzner Werber LLC

8400 East Prentice Avenue, Suite 1401

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/11/2021. ORDERED that, on or before January 25, 2021, defendant shall show cause why this case should not be remanded due to the Court's lack of subject matterjurisdiction. (sphil, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03377-PAB. (athom, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE NON CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Defendant Roddy Swope (Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Continue to Reschedule Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Angela Apuzzo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hart, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Todd Tenge on behalf of Angela ApuzzoAttorney James Todd Tenge added to party Angela Apuzzo(pty:pla) (Tenge, James) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Ashley Hart on behalf of Angela ApuzzoAttorney Elizabeth Ashley Hart added to party Angela Apuzzo(pty:pla) (Hart, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Roddy Swope.(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#4

(#4) RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint and Jury Demand upon Roddy Swope on 10/18/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Roddy Swope, filed by Angela Apuzzo.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roddy Swope from Larimer District Court, Case Number 2020CV30673. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7586719), filed by Roddy Swope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/11/2021. ORDERED that, on or before January 25, 2021, defendant shall show cause why this case should not be remanded due to the Court's lack of subject matterjurisdiction. (sphil, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03377-PAB. (athom, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Non-Consent Form. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03377-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE NON CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Defendant Roddy Swope (Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Given the unopposed nature of the Motion, the Court finds good cause to GRANT Plaintiff's Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for 1-25-2021 at 10:00 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 1-18-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#6] is due 1-18-2021. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12-10-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Continue to Reschedule Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Angela Apuzzo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Hart, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Todd Tenge on behalf of Angela ApuzzoAttorney James Todd Tenge added to party Angela Apuzzo(pty:pla) (Tenge, James) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Ashley Hart on behalf of Angela ApuzzoAttorney Elizabeth Ashley Hart added to party Angela Apuzzo(pty:pla) (Hart, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Roddy Swope.(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 1-11-2021 at 11:00 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 1-4-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#6] is due 1-4-2021. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11-13-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint and Jury Demand upon Roddy Swope on 10/18/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Roddy Swope, filed by Angela Apuzzo.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roddy Swope from Larimer District Court, Case Number 2020CV30673. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7586719), filed by Roddy Swope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Todd Tenge