This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:19:56 (UTC).

April Jezeskie v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by April Jezeskie against Andrew Saul in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Central District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07349

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

April Jezeskie

Defendant

Andrew Saul

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case is designated for electronic filing. See Local Rule 5-4. When a proposed order or other proposed document is lodged or accompanies a filing, a WordPerfect or Word copy of the proposed order or other proposed document shall also be e-mailed to: JC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (See document for details.) (sbou) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • (#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-7349 JC on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Safa, Cyrus) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff April Jezeskie, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/9/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Safa, Cyrus) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case is designated for electronic filing. See Local Rule 5-4. When a proposed order or other proposed document is lodged or accompanies a filing, a WordPerfect or Word copy of the proposed order or other proposed document shall also be e-mailed to: JC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (See document for details.) (sbou) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (sbou) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff April Jezeskie, (Safa, Cyrus) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff April Jezeskie. (Safa, Cyrus) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff April Jezeskie. (Safa, Cyrus) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff April Jezeskie. (Safa, Cyrus) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff April Jezeskie. (Attorney Cyrus Safa added to party April Jezeskie (pty:pla))(Safa, Cyrus) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.