This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 11:17:10 (UTC).

Appu v. Galliano Marine Service, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Appu filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Galliano Marine Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald K Appu

Defendants

Contender M/V

Galliano Marine Service, LLC

Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M Paul Skrabanek

Attorney at Pierce Skrabanek Bruera, PLLC

3701 Kirby Drive, Suite 760

Houston, TX 77098

Eduardo Javier Garza

Attorney at Pierce Skrabanek Bruera, PLLC

3701 Kirby Drive, Suite 760

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Perry McCleskey, Jr.

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Colin B. Cambre

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Taylor Michael Bologna

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Pretrial Notice

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 10/15/2021. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice)(clc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

7 #1

Pro Hac Vice Notice

#7

(#7) ORDER: GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eduardo Javier Garza. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

6 #4

Proposed Order

6 #3

Affidavit

6 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Affidavit

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eduardo J. Garza (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8728884) by Donald K Appu. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit, #4 Proposed Order)(Skrabanek, M) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2021 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Contender M/V, Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C..Attorney Taylor Michael Bologna added to party Contender M/V(pty:dft), Attorney Taylor Michael Bologna added to party Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Bologna, Taylor) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Galliano Marine Service, LLC. (lt) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Galliano Marine Service, LLC, Contender M/V (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8675973) filed by Donald Appu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney M Paul Skrabanek added to party Donald Appu(pty:pla).(Skrabanek, M) Modified text/filer on 1/8/2021 (lt). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 10/15/2021. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice)(clc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eduardo Javier Garza. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eduardo J. Garza (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8728884) by Donald K Appu. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit, #4 Proposed Order)(Skrabanek, M) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2021 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Contender M/V, Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C..Attorney Taylor Michael Bologna added to party Contender M/V(pty:dft), Attorney Taylor Michael Bologna added to party Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Bologna, Taylor) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Galliano Marine Service, LLC. (lt) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Galliano Marine Service, LLC, Contender M/V (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8675973) filed by Donald Appu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney M Paul Skrabanek added to party Donald Appu(pty:pla).(Skrabanek, M) Modified text/filer on 1/8/2021 (lt). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Galliano Marine Service, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eduardo Javier Garza

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Paul Skrabanek