This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2020 at 08:04:23 (UTC).

Appointment of Chief United States Magistrate Judge

Case Summary

On 08/01/2020 Appointment of Chief United States Magistrate Judge was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emily C. Marks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-MC-03920

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

 

Party Details

In Re

Appointment of Chief United States Magistrate Judge

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) ORDER APPOINTING CHIEF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is ORDERED that Stephen M. Doyle is hereby appointed to serve as Chief Magistrate Judge for the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama for a term of seven years beginning August 1, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/1/2020. (cwl, ) Modified on 8/4/2020 to correct filed date (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER APPOINTING CHIEF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is ORDERED that Stephen M. Doyle is hereby appointed to serve as Chief Magistrate Judge for the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama for a term of seven years beginning August 1, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/1/2020. (cwl, ) Modified on 8/4/2020 to correct filed date (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less