This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2022 at 07:33:51 (UTC).

Applied Biokinetics LLC v. KT Health, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Applied Biokinetics LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against KT Health, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00638

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Applied Biokinetics LLC

Defendant

KT Health, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Defendant Attorneys

Frederick L. Cottrell, III

Christine Dealy Haynes

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1-5

1 #2

Exhibit 6-9

1 #3

Exhibit 10-13

1 #4

Exhibit 14-17

1 #5

Exhibit 18-21

1 #6

Exhibit 22-25

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,414,511; 8,814,818; 8,834,398; 8,968,229; 10,212,987. (twk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Biokinetics LLC. KT Health, LLC served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to and including July 13, 2022 - filed by KT Health, LLC. (Haynes, Christine) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of KT Health, LLC (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: KT Health, LLC answer due 7/13/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/7/2022. (nms) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of KT Health, LLC (Cottrell, Frederick) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to and including July 13, 2022 - filed by KT Health, LLC. (Haynes, Christine) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Biokinetics LLC. KT Health, LLC served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,414,511; 8,814,818; 8,834,398; 8,968,229; 10,212,987. (twk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against KT Health, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3873395.) - filed by Applied Biokinetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-9, #3 Exhibit 10-13, #4 Exhibit 14-17, #5 Exhibit 18-21, #6 Exhibit 22-25, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less