This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:15:39 (UTC).

APPLICATION OF USA PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 3512 FOR ORDER FOR COMMISSIONER'S APPOINTMENT FOR FRAUD INVESTIGATION

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 APPLICATION OF USA PURSUANT TO 18 U S C 3512 FOR ORDER FOR COMMISSIONER'S APPOINTMENT FOR FRAUD INVESTIGATION was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B. Collings. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-ML-01288

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Collings

 

Party Details

Interested Party

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

In Re

APPLICATION OF USA PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 3512 FOR ORDER FOR COMMISSIONER'S APPOINTMENT FOR FRAUD INVESTIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Liudmila Batista

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1301 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting Application for Order Pursuant to Treaty on Mutual Assistance in Criminal Matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings on 10/21/2020. (ztd) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Order pursuant to the 18 U.S.C. 3512 Treaty on Mutual Assistance in Criminal Matters filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Batista, Liudmila) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting Application for Order Pursuant to Treaty on Mutual Assistance in Criminal Matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings on 10/21/2020. (ztd) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Order pursuant to the 18 U.S.C. 3512 Treaty on Mutual Assistance in Criminal Matters filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Batista, Liudmila) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less