This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2021 at 07:40:35 (UTC).

Apple Inc. v. Koss Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Apple Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Koss Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00495

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Apple Inc

Defendant

KOSS Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren Abendshien

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

200 South Wacker Drive, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Alan Littmann

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

200 South Wacker Drive, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael Pieja

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

200 South Wacker Drive, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Kenneth Frederick Baum

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

429 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 710

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Steven J. Wingard

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, L.L.P.

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Gina A. Johnson

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison St., Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Peter E. Soskin

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Erik J. Halverson

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison St., Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Benjamin E. Weed

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

70 W. Madison St., Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

83 #1

Proposed Order

#83

(#83) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pieja, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

82 #1

Proposed Order

#82

(#82) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kenneth Frederick Baum by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pieja, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#81

(#81) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Wingard on behalf of Apple Inc. Attorney Steven J. Wingard added to party Apple Inc(pty:pla) (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#80

(#80) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831760) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#79

(#79) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831747) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#78

(#78) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831739) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#77

(#77) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831727) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - US10506325

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - US10491982

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - US10469934

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - US10298451

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - US10206025

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Koss Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14790565.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US10206025, #2 Exhibit 2 - US10298451, #3 Exhibit 3 - US10469934, #4 Exhibit 4 - US10491982, #5 Exhibit 5 - US10506325, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

156 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pieja, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kenneth Frederick Baum by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pieja, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Wingard on behalf of Apple Inc. Attorney Steven J. Wingard added to party Apple Inc(pty:pla) (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831760) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831747) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831739) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831727) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831712) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14831626) by on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wingard, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Pro Hac Vice Letters to all attys of record upon transfer. Main document is Ltr to Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP Chicago Attys, Attachments: #1 to Atty Baum, #2 to K&L Gates, LLP Chicago Attys, #3 to Atty Soskin (lad) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/10/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14790792.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Abendshien, Lauren) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14790782.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Littmann, Alan) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Frederick Baum (Baum, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Pieja (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 10,206,025; 10,298,451; 10,469,934; 10,491,982; 10,506,325 (cc: form mailed to register). (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Koss Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14790565.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US10206025, #2 Exhibit 2 - US10298451, #3 Exhibit 3 - US10469934, #4 Exhibit 4 - US10491982, #5 Exhibit 5 - US10506325, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOSS Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth F. Baum

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven J. Wingard