This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 07:33:57 (UTC).

Apple Inc. v. Koss Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Apple Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Koss Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05504

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Apple Inc.

Defendant

Koss Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Thomas Pieja

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

200 South Wacker Drive, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Alan E. Littmann

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

200 South Wacker Drive, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Kenneth Frederick Baum

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

429 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 710

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Lauren C Abendshien

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

200 South Wacker Drive, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Peter Edward Soskin

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

24 #2

Proposed Order

24 #1

Exhibit A

#24

(#24) MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Koss Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/13/2020. Replies due by 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Koss Corporation (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1 filed by Apple Inc.. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1 filed by Apple Inc. and Koss Corporation. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Edward Soskin (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

9 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#9

(#19) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren Abendshien.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - US10506325

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - US10491982

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - US10469934

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - US10298451

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - US10206025

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Koss Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14790565.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US10206025, #2 Exhibit 2 - US10298451, #3 Exhibit 3 - US10469934, #4 Exhibit 4 - US10491982, #5 Exhibit 5 - US10506325, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The motion hearing previously set for 10/28/2020 is CONTINUED due to not being set in compliance with Civil Local Rule 7-2. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (Related documents(s) #24 )(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Koss Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/13/2020. Replies due by 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Koss Corporation (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Case division and case location information are incorrect. The correct information is Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:20-cv-5504 JST. Re: #22 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1 filed by Apple Inc.. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1 filed by Apple Inc. and Koss Corporation. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Edward Soskin (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren Abendshien.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alan E. Littmann.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/10/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14790792.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Abendshien, Lauren) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14790782.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Littmann, Alan) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Frederick Baum (Baum, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Pieja (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 10,206,025; 10,298,451; 10,469,934; 10,491,982; 10,506,325 (cc: form mailed to register). (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Koss Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14790565.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US10206025, #2 Exhibit 2 - US10298451, #3 Exhibit 3 - US10469934, #4 Exhibit 4 - US10491982, #5 Exhibit 5 - US10506325, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOSS Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant