This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2022 at 15:10:16 (UTC).

Apple, Inc. v. Koss Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Apple, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Koss Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-MC-80058

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Apple, Inc.

Respondent

Koss Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Elizabeth Cherise Callahan

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

555 Mission Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94105

James E. Berger

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Joshua Wan

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1104

Charlene C. Sun

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Erik R. Fuehrer

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 University Avenue

East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2214

Respondent Attorneys

Peter Edward Soskin

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Benjamin E Weed

Attorney at KLGates LLP

70 West Madison Street Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Christopher Valente

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

State Street Financial Center, One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111

Gina Alyse Johnson

Attorney at KL Gates LLP

70 W. Madison, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

54 #2

Exhibit B

54 #1

Exhibit A

54 #54

Main Document

#52

(#52) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #50 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byKoss Corporation. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 6/21/2022) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

50 #2

Proposed Order

50 #1

Declaration of Charlene Sun iso Apple Inc.'s Amended Admin Mot to Seal

50 #50

Main Document

47 #1

USM-285 CT Corporation

47 #47

Main Document

2 #4

*Restricted*

2 #3

Proposed Order

2 #2

Declaration of Sun

2 #1

Declaration of Lasker

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Order

1 #1

Declaration of Brown de Vejar

1 #1

Main Document

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re #47 Notice (Other) Certificate of Service by United States Marshals Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 6/29/2022) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Before the Court is the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. ECF No. #1 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing on this matter, currently scheduled for, July 7, 2022 is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #50 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byKoss Corporation. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 6/21/2022) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re #50 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Service of Unredacted Exhibits A-C (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charlene Sun iso Apple Inc.'s Amended Admin Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Because the Court has granted Apple's motion to amend its proposed redactions to its motion to seal, see ECF No. 48, Apple's motion to seal is terminated as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #22 Administrative Motion for Leave to Amend Proposed Redactions to its Motion to Seal. Within seven days, Apple shall refile an amended administrative motion to seal that includes a proposed order that reflects the specific portions of the documents Apple wishes to seal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 15, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE re #1 Petition (Miscellaneous Case Opening), (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2022: #1 USM-285 CT Corporation) (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #20 Administrative Motion For an Order Directing Service of Process by U.S. Marshals Service.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #17 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Because "Apple does not seek to seal any portion of Koss's Opposition and, therefore, does not intend to submit a declaration in support of sealing Koss's Opposition pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(f)(3)," ECF No. 19 at 2, the motion at ECF No. 17 is terminated as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re #1 Petition (Miscellaneous Case Opening), #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Callahan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Callahan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16945348.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Sun, Charlene) (Filed on 2/28/2022) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16945309.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Berger, James) (Filed on 2/28/2022) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16945152.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Wan, Joshua) (Filed on 2/28/2022) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2022) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Callahan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callahan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lasker, #2 Declaration of Sun, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #5 Unredacted Declaration of Brown de Vejar)(Callahan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Koss Corporation ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-16940490.). Filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brown de Vejar, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Callahan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOSS Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter E. Soskin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina A Johnson