This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2021 at 08:05:46 (UTC).

APPEX PROPERTIES LLC v. WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 APPEX PROPERTIES LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01020

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APPEX PROPERTIES, LLC. D/B/A IVORY INVESTMENTS LLC

APPEX PROPERTIES LLC doing business as IVORY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBIN LUIS REYES

Attorney at INSURANCE LITIGATION GROUP - NORTH MIAMI FL

1500 Ne 162Nd Street

North Miami, FL 33162

Defendant Attorneys

AARON FORTIER

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP - TAMPA FL

400 North Ashley Driveste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

VINCENT A FERNANDEZ

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP - TAMPA FL

400 North Ashley Driveste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

TROY JONATHAN SEIBERT

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP - TAMPA FL

400 North Ashley Driveste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRALRe: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: ( Discovery due by 8/1/2022., Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 9/9/2022., Mediation Report due by 7/14/2022.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AIG for WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (SEIBERT, TROY) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (REYES, ROBIN) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#6

(#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SEIBERT, TROY) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/1/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2021. Discovery due by 4/18/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/18/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN LUIS REYES on behalf of All Plaintiffs (REYES, ROBIN) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to LEVI GLICK, ESQ. on behalf of APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (jcw) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to ENRIQUE PINEIRO, ESQ. on behalf of APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (jcw) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRALRe: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: ( Discovery due by 8/1/2022., Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 9/9/2022., Mediation Report due by 7/14/2022.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AIG for WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (SEIBERT, TROY) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (REYES, ROBIN) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (jcw) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SEIBERT, TROY) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/1/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2021. Discovery due by 4/18/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/18/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (See proposed ISO) (jcw) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN LUIS REYES on behalf of All Plaintiffs (REYES, ROBIN) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2 Notice of Attorney Admission, #3 Notice of Attorney Admission - 30 days has elapsed without an appearance of counsel for Plaintiff. (jcw) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadline - Clerk to check status of #2 , #3 Attorney Admission on 10/13/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to LEVI GLICK, ESQ. on behalf of APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (jcw) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to ENRIQUE PINEIRO, ESQ. on behalf of APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (jcw) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY from 1st Judicial Circuit, case number 2021 CA 000902. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6304421.), filed by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (SEIBERT, TROY) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant