This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 08:09:35 (UTC).

Appen Media Group, Inc. v. Google LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 Appen Media Group, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02905

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Appen Media Group, Inc.

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Google LLC

Facebook, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Fuller

Attorney at Farrell & Fuller, LLC

1311 Ponce De Leon, Suite 202

San Juan, PR 00907

Paul T. Farrell, Jr.

Attorney at Farrell & Fuller, LLC

1311 Ponce De Leon, Suite 202

Santurce, PR 00907

Serina M. Vash

Attorney at Herman Jones LLP

P.O. Box 131, 153 Central Avenue

Westfiled, NJ 07090

Stuart A. Davidson

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP -FL

Suite 500, 120 E. Palmetto Park Road

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Clayton Fitzsimmons

Attorney at Fitzsimmons Law Firm PLLC

1609 Warwood Avenue

Wheeling, WV 26003

David W. Mitchell

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP - SD

655 W. Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

John C. Herman

Attorney at Herman Jones LLP

3424 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1650

Atlanta, GA 30326

Paul J. Geller

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP -FL

Suite 500, 120 E. Palmetto Park Road

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Robert P. Fitzsimmons

Attorney at Fitzsimmons Law Firm PLLC

1609 Warwood Avenue

Wheeling, WV 26003

Steven M. Jodlowski

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP - SD

655 W. Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/3/2022. (tas) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#3

(#3) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David W. Mitchell. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#4

(#4) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Robert P. Fitzsimmons. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#5

(#5) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Clayton Fitzsimmons. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#6

(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David W. Mitchell. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven M. Jodlowski. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Appen Media Group, Inc.. Meta Platforms, Inc. waiver mailed on 8/2/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Herman, John) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Appen Media Group, Inc.. Google LLC waiver mailed on 8/2/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Herman, John) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Appen Media Group, Inc.. Google LLC waiver mailed on 8/2/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Herman, John) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Appen Media Group, Inc.. Meta Platforms, Inc. waiver mailed on 8/2/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Herman, John) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Steven M. Jodlowski. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David W. Mitchell. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Clayton Fitzsimmons. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Robert P. Fitzsimmons. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David W. Mitchell. Clerk to follow-up by 8/18/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/3/2022. (tas) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11946134) filed by Appen Media Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert P. Fitzsimmons