This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2023 at 07:47:39 (UTC).

Apollo-Ridge School District v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Apollo-Ridge School District filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-08899

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Apollo-Ridge School District

Defendants

Juul Labs Inc.

Altria Group Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distibution Company

Philip Morris USA Inc.

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

John Does 1-100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas W. King, III

Attorney at Dillon McCandless King Coulter & Graham, LLP

128 West Cunningham Street

Butler, PA 16001

 

Court Documents

11 #1

*Restricted*

11 #11

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#10

(#10) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jd) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#9

(#9) Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jd) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit

8 #8

Main Document

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/1/2022. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

4 #9

Summons

4 #8

Summons

4 #7

Summons

4 #6

Summons

4 #5

Summons

4 #4

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

4 #4

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2913: From Western District of Pennsylvania, 2:22cv01689, Apollo-Ridge School District v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-08899-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 97 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:22-cv-01689. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to District of Northern California. (jd) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jd) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jd) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by APOLLO-RIDGE SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (King, Thomas) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/1/2022. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons) (jd) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by APOLLO-RIDGE SCHOOL DISTRICT (jd) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JOHN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7416785), filed by APOLLO-RIDGE SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less