This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2023 at 09:04:23 (UTC).

Apex Systems, LLC v. Foster

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Apex Systems, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Foster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lydia Kay Griggsby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02978

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lydia Kay Griggsby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Apex Systems, LLC

Defendant

Robert L Foster, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura Denise Windsor

John Brian Cashmere

Amanda Weaver

 

Court Documents

21 #2

Text of Proposed Order

21 #1

Exhibit 1 in Support of Request

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) NOTICE by Apex Systems, LLC re #18 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense Proposed Order (Cashmere, John) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Apex Systems, LLC(Weaver, Amanda) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file a motion for clerks entry of default and a motion for default judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 12/21/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

14 #1

Attachment 1 - Signature Pages

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Attachment 1 - Signature Pages

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Apex Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent On Assignment, Inc. for Apex Systems, LLC.(Cashmere, John) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Apex Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 in Support of Request, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, Amanda) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Apex Systems, LLC re #18 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense Proposed Order (Cashmere, John) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) QC NOTICE: #18 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Apex Systems, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #18 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Apex Systems, LLC(Weaver, Amanda) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file a motion for clerks entry of default and a motion for default judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 12/21/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amanda Weaver. Directing attorney Amanda Weaver to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Laura Denise Windsor. Directing attorney Laura Denise Windsor to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda M. Weaver (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10305677.) by Apex Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Signature Pages)(Cashmere, John) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura D. Windsor (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10305646.) by Apex Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Signature Pages)(Cashmere, John) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER directing Apex Systems, LLC to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/27/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Apex Systems, LLC files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 12/5/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Apex Systems, LLC must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent/declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. Your document has been marked as FILED IN ERROR and the link disabled. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) [FILED IN ERROR] Consent to Magistrate Judge (Cashmere, John) Modified on 12/5/2022 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apex Systems, LLC. Robert L Foster, Jr served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022.(Cashmere, John) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 11/17/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) (FILED IN ERROR)Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 11/17/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/17/2022 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Apex Systems, LLC or counsel for Apex Systems, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/1/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Apex Systems, LLC.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Apex Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent On Assignment, Inc. for Apex Systems, LLC.(Cashmere, John) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration against Robert L Foster, Jr ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10273876.), filed by Apex Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Cashmere, John) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less