This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2019 at 08:09:10 (UTC).

Aperture Net LLC v. Razer USA Ltd.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Aperture Net LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Razer USA Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02056

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aperture Net LLC

Defendant

Razer USA Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 22, 2019 - filed by Aperture Net LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 23, 2019 - filed by Aperture Net LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aperture Net LLC. Razer USA Ltd. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/03/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aperture Net LLC. (mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 6,711,204 B2. (mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Razer USA Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2766471.) - filed by Aperture Net LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 22, 2019 - filed by Aperture Net LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Razer USA Ltd. answer due 12/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/21/2019. (nms) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 23, 2019 - filed by Aperture Net LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02054-RGA, 1:19-cv-02055-RGA, 1:19-cv-02056-RGA, 1:19-cv-02057-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aperture Net LLC. Razer USA Ltd. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Razer USA Ltd. on 10/30/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aperture Net LLC. (mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 6,711,204 B2. (mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Razer USA Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2766471.) - filed by Aperture Net LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Razer USA is a litigant

Latest cases where Aperture Net LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis