Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2021 at 08:40:31 (UTC).

APC Towers III, LLC v. The City of Orlando, Florida et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 APC Towers III, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The City of Orlando, Florida. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00537

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APC TOWERS III LLC

APC Towers III, LLC

Defendants

John Hugh Dyer

Antonio Ortiz

The City of Orlando, Florida

Buddy

Regina I. Hill

Tony

Bakari F Burns

Robert F. Stuart

The City Council of The City of Orlando Florida

Patty Sheehan

James Gray

Bakari F. Burns

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Blum

Attorney at David Blum, PA

Po Box 7624

Seminole, FL 33775

Mattaniah Suiter Jahn

935 Main Street, Suite D1

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant Attorneys

Suzanne E. Gilbert

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP - Orlando

200 S Orange Ave - Ste 2600

Orlando, FL 32801

Paul Joseph Punzone

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bakari F. Burns, John Hugh Dyer, James Gray, Regina I. Hill, Antonio Ortiz, Patty Sheehan, Robert F. Stuart, The City Council of The City of Orlando Florida, The City of Orlando, Florida. (Gilbert, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bakari F. Burns, John Hugh Dyer, James Gray, Regina I. Hill, Antonio Ortiz, Patty Sheehan, Robert F. Stuart, The City Council of The City of Orlando Florida. (Gilbert, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The City of Orlando, Florida.(Gilbert, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

1 #18

Proposed Summons

1 #17

Exhibit Ex 10

1 #16

Exhibit Ex 9

1 #15

Exhibit Ex 8

1 #14

Exhibit Ex 7

1 #13

Exhibit Ex 6

1 #9

Exhibit Ex 2

1 #8

Exhibit Ex 1 601-894

1 #7

Exhibit Ex 1 pages 551-600

1 #6

Exhibit Ex 1 pages 526-550

1 #5

Exhibit Ex 1 pages 501-525

1 #4

Exhibit Ex 1 pages 451-500

1 #3

Exhibit Ex 1 pages 301-450

1 #2

Exhibit Ex 1 pages 1-300

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 113A-18043416) filed by APC Towers III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 1-300, #3 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 301-450, #4 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 451-500, #5 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 501-525, #6 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 526-550, #7 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 551-600, #8 Exhibit Ex 1 601-894, #9 Exhibit Ex 2, #10 Exhibit Ex 3, #11 Exhibit Ex 4, #12 Exhibit Ex 5, #13 Exhibit Ex 6, #14 Exhibit Ex 7, #15 Exhibit Ex 8, #16 Exhibit Ex 9, #17 Exhibit Ex 10, #18 Proposed Summons)(Blum, David) Modified text on 3/25/2021 (ARJ). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bakari F. Burns, John Hugh Dyer, James Gray, Regina I. Hill, Antonio Ortiz, Patty Sheehan, Robert F. Stuart, The City Council of The City of Orlando Florida, The City of Orlando, Florida. (Gilbert, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bakari F. Burns, John Hugh Dyer, James Gray, Regina I. Hill, Antonio Ortiz, Patty Sheehan, Robert F. Stuart, The City Council of The City of Orlando Florida. (Gilbert, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The City of Orlando, Florida.(Gilbert, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne E. Gilbert on behalf of Bakari F. Burns, John Hugh Dyer, James Gray, Regina I. Hill, Antonio Ortiz, Patty Sheehan, Robert F. Stuart, The City Council of The City of Orlando Florida, The City of Orlando, Florida (Gilbert, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Joseph Punzone on behalf of Bakari F. Burns, John Hugh Dyer, James Gray, Regina I. Hill, Antonio Ortiz, Patty Sheehan, Robert F. Stuart, The City Council of The City of Orlando Florida, The City of Orlando, Florida (Punzone, Paul) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by APC Towers III, LLC. (Jahn, Mattaniah) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by APC Towers III, LLC. Related case(s): No (Jahn, Mattaniah) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/2/2021. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:21-cv-00537-WWB-LRH. Judge John Antoon II no longer assigned to the case. (ALL) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (ARJ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/25/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-0537-JA-LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 113A-18043416) filed by APC Towers III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 1-300, #3 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 301-450, #4 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 451-500, #5 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 501-525, #6 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 526-550, #7 Exhibit Ex 1 pages 551-600, #8 Exhibit Ex 1 601-894, #9 Exhibit Ex 2, #10 Exhibit Ex 3, #11 Exhibit Ex 4, #12 Exhibit Ex 5, #13 Exhibit Ex 6, #14 Exhibit Ex 7, #15 Exhibit Ex 8, #16 Exhibit Ex 9, #17 Exhibit Ex 10, #18 Proposed Summons)(Blum, David) Modified text on 3/25/2021 (ARJ). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUDDY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Tony is a litigant