This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2021 at 09:37:30 (UTC).

AOS Holding Company et al v. Rheem Manufacturing Company

Case Summary

On June 29, 2021, AOS Holding Company and A. O. Smith Corporation (collectively, “AOS” or “Plaintiffs”), represented by David A. Bilson of Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A. and John C. Phillips, Jr. of Phillips, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A. filed an Intellectual Property Lawsuit against Rheem Manufacturing Company (“Rheem” or “Defendant”), seeking declaration of infringement, compensatory damages and costs for allegedly infringing the patented technology related to a Gas Water Heater owned by Plaintiffs. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Delaware with Judge Leonard P. Stark presiding.

 

In their complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “The owner of the ’897 patent by assignment is AOS Holding Company. A. O. Smith Corporation is the only licensee of the ’897 patent, and as such A. O. Smith Corporation is the only entity other than AOS Holding Company permitted to practice and/or profit from the invention embodied in the ’897 patent. The Rheem GNU water heaters incorporate AOS’s innovative and patented technology. The Rheem GNU water heaters directly infringe AOS’s ’897 patent or induce infringement by their installers and/or users.”

 

Plaintiffs further alleged that, “Rheem’s unauthorized infringing activities are interfering with AOS’s customer relationships and causing AOS to incur monetary damages and suffer irreparable harm. AOS brings this action seeking relief for Rheem’s ongoing patent infringement. Upon information and belief, Rheem is and has been aware of its infringement of AOS’s ’897 patent at least due to its knowledge about the lawsuit AOS filed against Bradford White Corporation in this Court (C.A. No. 18-412-LPS), and yet Rheem has failed to cease its infringing activities.”

 

Plaintiffs also alleged that, “As a direct and proximate result of Rheem’s conduct, AOS has suffered and will continue to suffer substantial injury and damage in an amount to be determined at trial, as well as irreparable harm, for which AOS has no adequate remedy at law, unless Rheem is enjoined from infringing the ʼ897 patent.” 

 

There is one claim for relief by the Plaintiffs dealing with the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,375,897 wherein Plaintiffs alleged that Rheem’s acts infringing the ’897 patent will continue unless enjoined by the Court, and will cause AOS further injury and damage, including immediate and irreparable harm that cannot be adequately compensated by monetary damages.

 

In their prayer for relief the Plaintiffs requested the court to enter an order against Defendant finding that Rheem has infringed the ʼ897 patent, preliminary and permanent injunction enjoining Rheem directly or indirectly, from contributing to the infringement of the ʼ897 patent, awarding damages adequate to compensate AOS for Rheem’s past infringement of the of the ʼ897 patent together with pre-judgment interest, post-judgment interest. Plaintiffs further requested the Court to award AOS treble damages as a result of Rheem’s willful and deliberate infringement of the ʼ897 patent, declare that this is an exceptional case entitling AOS to its reasonable attorneys’ fees under 35 U.S.C. § 285, and grant other reliefs as deemed appropriate by the Court.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00947

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A.O. Smith Corporation

AOS Holding Company

Defendant

Rheem Manufacturing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 N. Broom St

Wilmington, DE 19806

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by A.O. Smith Corporation, AOS Holding Company (Phillips, John) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent A.O. Smith Corporation for AOS Holding Company and A.O. Smith Corporation. filed by AOS Holding Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation (apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,375,897. (apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Rheem Manufacturing Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3646704.) - filed by AOS Holding Company, A.O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by A.O. Smith Corporation, AOS Holding Company (Phillips, John) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent A.O. Smith Corporation for AOS Holding Company and A.O. Smith Corporation. filed by AOS Holding Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation (apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,375,897. (apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Rheem Manufacturing Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3646704.) - filed by AOS Holding Company, A.O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where A. O. Smith Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Bilson