This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 09:33:36 (UTC).

AOM Music, Inc. v. Benito Antonio Martnez Ocasio et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 AOM Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Benito Antonio Martnez Ocasio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07691

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AOM Music, Inc.

Defendants

Benito Antonio Martnez Ocasio

Marcos Efrain Masis

Randy Ariel Ortiz Acevedo

Joel Muoz

Edwin Rosa

Ormani Perez Gonzales

Rimas Entertainment LLC

CDA Music Group Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as DJ Negro Publising

EMI Blackwood Music Inc

Songs of Universal, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Risamar Publishing

The Royalty Network, Inc. a New York corporation doing business as Teynor

Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc.

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neville Lawrence Johnson

Attorney at Johnson and Johnson LLP

439 North Canon Drive Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Daniel Boris Lifschitz

Attorney at Johnson and Johnson LLP

439 North Canon Drive Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Nima Kamali

Attorney at Johnson and Johnson LLP

439 North Canon Drive Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (et) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff AOM Music, Inc.. upon Benito Antonio Martnez Ocasio waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kenneth D. Freundlich, Counsel for Defendant. (Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff AOM Music, Inc.. upon Rimas Entertainment LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kenneth D. Freundlich, Counsel for Defendant. (Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff AOM Music, Inc.. upon Rimas Entertainment LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kenneth D. Freundlich, Counsel for Defendant. (Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff AOM Music, Inc.. upon Benito Antonio Martnez Ocasio waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kenneth D. Freundlich, Counsel for Defendant. (Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (et) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants CDA Music Group Inc., Does, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Benito Antonio Martnez Ocasio, Marcos Efrain Masis, Joel Muoz, Randy Ariel Ortiz Acevedo, Ormani Perez Gonzales, Rimas Entertainment LLC, Edwin Rosa, Songs of Universal, Inc., The Royalty Network, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by AOM Music, INC., a Florida corporation. (Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AOM Music, INC., a Florida corporation, identifying AOM Music, INC., a Florida corporation, Benito Antonio Martnez Ocasio p/k/a Bad Bunny, an individual; Marcos Efrain Masis p/k/a Tainy, an individual; Randy Ariel Ortiz Acevedo p/k/a Randy, an individual; Joel Muoz p/k/a Jowell, an individual; Edwin Rosa p/k/a engo Flow, an individual; Ormani Perez Gonzales p/k/a DJ Orma, an individual; Rimas Entertainment LLC, a Puerto Rican limited liability company; CDA Music Group INC. d/b/a DJ Negro Publishing, a Florida corporation; EMI Blackwood Music INC, a Connecticut corporation; Songs of Universal, INC. d/b/a Risamar Publishing, a California corporation; The Royalty Network, INC. d/b/a Teynor Music, a New York corporation; Universal Songs of Polygram International INC., a Delaware corporation; Does 1-10. (Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AOM Music, INC., a Florida corporation. (Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff AOM Music, INC., a Florida corporation. (Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32055351 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff AOM Music, INC., a Florida corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Neville Lawrence Johnson added to party AOM Music, INC., a Florida corporation(pty:pla))(Johnson, Neville) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Royalty Network Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Songs of Universal, Inc. is a litigant