This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 11:30:18 (UTC).

Antsy Labs, LLC et al v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 Antsy Labs, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01801

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Antsy Labs, LLC

Zuru Inc.

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Kong Dong Li

Ant Factory Store (1)

BINBIN88 Store (2)

BINBIN88 Store (3)

BlocksPark Store (4)

Children's interesting world Store (5)

children's party 233 Store (6)

China DBZ Store (7)

chinashoppingtoy Store (8)

Dafa shop Store (9)

Disneys KidZone Toy Store (10)

Drop-Shipping. Store (11)

Educational Toy City Store (12)

FIDGET TOY SHOP Store (13)

Guisi toy Store (14)

Gukulo toy Store (15)

HG Toy Store (16)

139 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Tom

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main Street, Suite 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

Harry Moren

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main Street, Suite 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

David Edward Hutchinson

Attorney at Thoits Law

47 W Polk Street, Ste 100 #221

Chicago, IL 60605

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) motion limiting asset restraint by Sheebo (71) (Agreed) (Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#34

(#34) NOTICE by Sheebo and/or 5050 Style to withdraw prior pleading and letter (Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#33

(#33) OBJECTIONS by Kong Dong Li to motion for preliminary injunction order (cxr, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#32

(#32) MOTION by Defendant Kong Dong Li to vacate preliminary injunction order. (cxr, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. of (Defendant No. 153 of Schedule A) the amazin' jungle (online marketplace wish) (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#29

(#29) letter by Sheebo and/or 5050 Style to Judge Ellis requesting hearing (Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

24 #3

Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

24 #2

Declaration Declaration of David E. Hutchinson in Support of Motion for Prelimin

24 #1

Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Jun

8 #10

Exhibit 1 to Stephen Drysdale's Declaration

8 #6

Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of David Hutchinson

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Schedule A Provisionally Filed Under Seal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Fidget Cube Copyright

#1

(#7) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) motion limiting asset restraint by Sheebo (71) (Agreed) (Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE by Sheebo and/or 5050 Style to withdraw prior pleading and letter (Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Ant Factory Store (1), BINBIN88 Store (2), BINBIN88 Store (3), BlocksPark Store (4), Children's interesting world Store (5), children's party 233 Store (6), China DBZ Store (7), chinashoppingtoy Store (8), Dafa shop Store (9), Disneys KidZone Toy Store (10), Drop-Shipping. Store (11), Educational Toy City Store (12), FIDGET TOY SHOP Store (13), Guisi toy Store (14), Gukulo toy Store (15), HG Toy Store (16), JENEEY ONE Official Store (17), Kids kissy Store (18), LANYIN Store (19), Lin-Xuan Store (20), Little Stars Mother&Baby Supplier Store (21), loving pig toy Store (22), Luka Baby Store (23), MM baby DD Store (24), MySkye Store (25), New Kid toy world Store (26), Panen Global Dropshipping Store (27), Pink Toy Store (28), PlayFun Toy Store (29), PokemonES flashcard Store (30), POP-IT-TOY Store (31), PUWEI Toy Store (32), -QAQ- Store (33), Qi Qiyang Store (34), Qiye toys Official Store (35), Shop1100044136 Store (36), Shop1100052142 Store (37), Shop5076296 Store (38), Sifire toy Store (39), TAOZHIHONG Toy Store (40), The elves Store (41), Variety Toy Store (42), Wonder Toy Garden Store (43), Wood-123 Store (44), XF Toy Factory Store (45), YFXX Store (46), YIXUAN888 Store (47), YYYToy Store (48), chengdourongguihuashangmaoyouxiangongsi (49), Crudey (50), cwogzhw8kcmt (51), DGVENCHY (52), DOMILA STORE (53), DRAGONFLYDREAMS (54), Duaecwvt(No.90898519 ) (55), EA Gifts and Crafts Co., LTD (56), Eoqiza (57), FabQuality...(58), FIDGET DICE (59), GERUIOU (60), Hiboom US (61), HongDeng (62), JIUHU (63), Kakaixi (64), kjhgk(8-20 days delivery) (65), Knfui (66), luchengouxingyuan (67), MLMZSM (68), seller-best (69), Shaoze Trading (70), Sheebo (71), singerling 7-12 Days Arrival (72), Synkee (73), Thermacellre (74), amazing888 (75), annng117 (76), annng117 (77), B2b_sellers (78), best_kitchen_home (79), big_family_home (80), bubble poppers (81), buyyourmask (82), fashion_home_best (83), Fidget Toys (84), gowinwin (85), home_for_you (86), honest_seller_2020 (87), hot_items_home (88), hy_cos (89), hy_monkey (90), hy_moon (91), idealtoy (92), kaiyue608 (93), king_toy (94), kitchen_for_you (95), little mermaid (96), little_rrainbow (97), love_fashion_home (98), luckys_toy (99), new_items_home (100), nin_home (101), octopus_wholesale (102), pengjing1995 (103), popit (104), siliconestore88 (105), stripedhgate (106), super_hunter111 (107), topseller1688 (108), toystorys (109), trusttoy (110), Welcome to DH Chen1689 (111), wn900store (112), wonopeshop (113), yijiantech (114), zhazha3 (115), zhizihua (116), zyenan (117), abdin-brothersltd (118), asabulaths0 (119), baikuan666 (120), barrotji (121), bznest (122), dexnor.store (123), donuts76 (124), fabronik (125), gadgetspace (126), greatdealspotter (127), h-shein (128), innovazionsolutions0308 (129), jamiesemporium2k16 (130), jgarey88 (131), latiendadigital2014 (132), mandelin647 (133), markb3011 (134), max_mmm (135), nanapan (136), powerful-top (137), soundadvice108 (138), sp-batson (139), textilebestbuys (140), udigaya_0 (141), udigaya0 (142), zanalch-0 (143), sweethvery (144), Cindye66 (145), Cute Ornament World (146), HoGaPlus (147), kangfengay2251 (148), liujiajun28448 (149), Lminer (150), MagCathywYxXpD (151), qiaoyanhao (152), the amazin' jungle (153), yuzhenghao5713 (154) and zhanghurong2380 (155) added to case caption. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OBJECTIONS by Kong Dong Li to motion for preliminary injunction order (cxr, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION by Defendant Kong Dong Li to vacate preliminary injunction order. (cxr, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. of (Defendant No. 153 of Schedule A) the amazin' jungle (online marketplace wish) (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) letter by Sheebo and/or 5050 Style to Judge Ellis requesting hearing (Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #24 . The Thoits Law firm is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days, instructions can be found on the Court's website located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. The Court strikes the status date set for 5/26/2022 and resets it to 6/22/2022 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff should file any motion for default judgment and notice it for presentment for the next status date. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Kong Dong Li (cxr, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION by Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Heretoto dissolve injunction as to SHEEBO (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support)(Rosenbaum, Cory) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. by Harry Moren (Moren, Harry) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. by Christopher M. Tom (Tom, Christopher) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. Exhibit 2 of S. Drysdale's Declaration regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. for leave to file excess pages Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limitation in Their Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of A Temporary Restraining Order #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of 18, #2 Exhibit 2 of 18, #3 Exhibit 3 of 18, #4 Exhibit 4 of 18, #5 Exhibit 5 of 18, #6 Exhibit 6 of 18, #7 Exhibit 7 of 18, #8 Exhibit 8 of 18, #9 Exhibit 9 of 18, #10 Exhibit 10 of 18, #11 Exhibit 11 of 18, #12 Exhibit 12 of 18, #13 Exhibit 13 of 18, #14 Exhibit 14 of 18, #15 Exhibit 15 of 18, #16 Exhibit 16 of 18, #17 Exhibit 17 of 18, #18 Exhibit 18 of 18)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. for leave to file excess pages Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limitation in Their Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of A Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in support of Ex Parte Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration of David Hutchinson, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of David Hutchinson, #4 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of David Hutchinson, #5 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of David Hutchinson, #6 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of David Hutchinson, #7 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of David Hutchinson, #8 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of David Hutchinson, #9 Declaration of Stephen Drysdale, #10 Exhibit 1 to Stephen Drysdale's Declaration, #11 Exhibit 2 to Stephen Drysdale's Declaration (to be filed under seal))(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc. by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Antsy Labs, LLC, Zuru Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19321977. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fidget Cube Copyright, #2 Exhibit 2 - Schedule A Provisionally Filed Under Seal)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto is a litigant

Latest cases where Zuru Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M. Tom

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Edward Hutchinson