This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:53:22 (UTC).

ANTONUCCI et al v. BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 ANTONUCCI filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Paradise Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00115

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Paradise Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUSAN ANTONUCCI

CARL C. ANTONUCCI

Defendant

BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan Scott Hofeld

Attorney at SCHLESINGER LAW OFFICES

1212 Se 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Jeffrey L. Haberman

Attorney at Schlesinger Law Offices, P.A.

1212 S.E. 3Rd Ave.

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Charles Bland Patrick

Attorney at SCHLESINGER LAW OFFICES

1212 Southeast Third Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Bonasso

Attorney at FLAHERTY SENSABAUGH & BONASSO

P. O. Box 3843

Charleston, WV 25338-3843

Jon A. Strongman

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Kevin Lloyd Morrow

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS

Suite 4300, 311 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

James H. Keale

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

100 Mulberry Street, Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301

Newark, NJ 07102

Michelle M Tessier

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

90 S 7Th St, Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Shane D. Valenzi

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Thomas J. Joensen

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

801 Grand Avenue, 33Rd Floor

Des Moines, IA 50309

Lauren J.F. Barta

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. 7Th St.

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Amy J. Roy

Attorney at Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) ORDER granting #48 Motion for Jeffrey L. Haberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/18/2020. (esa) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

48 #1

Proposed Order

#48

(#48) MOTION for attorney Jeffrey L. Haberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5694611) by CARL C. ANTONUCCI, SUSAN ANTONUCCI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#46

(#46) ORDER granting #43 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Shane D. Valenzi for BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION. Attorney Jon A. Strongman terminated.Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/08/2020. (esa) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#45

(#45) ORDER granting #44 Motion for Thomas J. Joensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/08/2020. (esa) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

44 #2

Proposed Order

44 #1

Affidavit of Thomas J. Joensen

#44

(#44) MOTION for attorney Thomas J. Joensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5665339) by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas J. Joensen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Joensen, Thomas) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#43

(#43) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION. (Valenzi, Shane) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jeffrey L. Haberman on behalf of Susan Antonucci. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #2 Electronic Summons Issued,. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 7/9/2013, answer due 7/30/2013. (Patrick, Charles) (Entered: 07/23/2013)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2013)

#3

(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 49 (Order re: Termination of parties no longer named in Short Form and Amended Short Form Complaints) entered on 06/10/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (jap) (Entered: 07/02/2013)

#2

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #2 Electronic Summons Issued,. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 7/9/2013, answer due 7/30/2013. (Patrick, Charles) (Entered: 07/23/2013)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jws) (Entered: 07/01/2013)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/25/2020. Trial scheduled for February 8, 2021. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER granting #48 Motion for Jeffrey L. Haberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/18/2020. (esa) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION for attorney Jeffrey L. Haberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5694611) by CARL C. ANTONUCCI, SUSAN ANTONUCCI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket(#47) TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Parties should be prepared to discuss potential dates for trial. Parties are directed to contact the Court on its conference line at 888-363-4749 and use access code 7686665. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/17/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER granting #43 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Shane D. Valenzi for BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION. Attorney Jon A. Strongman terminated.Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/08/2020. (esa) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting #44 Motion for Thomas J. Joensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/08/2020. (esa) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION for attorney Thomas J. Joensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5665339) by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas J. Joensen, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Joensen, Thomas) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION. (Valenzi, Shane) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #39 Motion for Lauren J.F. Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 05/27/2020. (esa) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #40 Motion for Michelle M. Tessier to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 05/27/2020. (esa) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci of Dr. Adam Holzberg on 05/30/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Carl C. Antonucci, Susan Antonucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jeffrey L. Haberman on behalf of Susan Antonucci. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #2 Electronic Summons Issued,. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 7/9/2013, answer due 7/30/2013. (Patrick, Charles) (Entered: 07/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 49 (Order re: Termination of parties no longer named in Short Form and Amended Short Form Complaints) entered on 06/10/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (jap) (Entered: 07/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jws) (Entered: 07/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2508561. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws) (Entered: 07/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less