This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2020 at 18:55:18 (UTC).

Antonio Williams et al v. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Antonio Williams filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal, Kenly Kiya Kato and Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01250

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

Presiding Judges

Jesus G. Bernal

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Arias

Antonio Williams

Defendants

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Misao Kurata

James Alexander De Sario

Michael Nourmand

Jose Maria D Patino, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Corinne K Hays

John D Ellis

Paul S Cowie

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Matter called. Counsel of record are present as referenced above. As this case is related to the case in Burnell v. Swift (ED 10-00809 VAP). Plaintiff has filed his objections in that case to the Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement. The Court having taken under submission the Motion in the Burnell case this action is also submitted. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (bm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#16

(#16) MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips:Court and counsel confer regarding this case as it refers to the Burnell case and the pending settlement. Court having heard from counsel, continues the Scheduling Conference to December 2, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (bm) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#15

(#15) REPORT of JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. (Hays, Corinne) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Nourmand counsel for Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. Jose Maria D. Patino, Jr. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Antonio Williams, et al.. (Nourmand, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:10-cv-00809 VAP(OPx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01250 VAP(KKx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#10

(#10) OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #9 filed by Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. (Nourmand, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by DEFENDANT Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT Related Case(s): 10-cv-00809-VAP-OP; 12-cv-00692-VAP-OP; 14-cv-02206-VAP-KK; 19-cv-04217-VAP-KK (Hays, Corinne) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC., Does 1 through 100. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/18/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, 1-1 #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/02/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Matter called. Counsel of record are present as referenced above. As this case is related to the case in Burnell v. Swift (ED 10-00809 VAP). Plaintiff has filed his objections in that case to the Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement. The Court having taken under submission the Motion in the Burnell case this action is also submitted. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (bm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips:Court and counsel confer regarding this case as it refers to the Burnell case and the pending settlement. Court having heard from counsel, continues the Scheduling Conference to December 2, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (bm) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) REPORT of JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. (Hays, Corinne) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Nourmand counsel for Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. Jose Maria D. Patino, Jr. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Antonio Williams, et al.. (Nourmand, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:10-cv-00809 VAP(OPx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-01250 VAP(KKx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (rn) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2019
View Court Documents

(#10) OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #9 filed by Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. (Nourmand, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2019
View Court Documents

(#9) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by DEFENDANT Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT Related Case(s): 10-cv-00809-VAP-OP; 12-cv-00692-VAP-OP; 14-cv-02206-VAP-KK; 19-cv-04217-VAP-KK (Hays, Corinne) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/22/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-13)(lh) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/08/2019

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-7)(lh) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona LLC., Does 1 through 100. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs James Arias, Antonio Williams. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/18/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, 1-1 #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 , Declaration #3 served on 7/8/2019. (Cowie, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC, identifying Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Co., LLC, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC Antonio Williams, James Arias. (Cowie, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC identifying Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Cowie, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

(#3) DECLARATION of Robin Rohwer re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC. (Cowie, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC. (Cowie, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1833454 Receipt No: 0973-24042446 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Attorney Paul S Cowie added to party Swift Transportation Co of Arizona LLC(pty:dft))(Cowie, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less