This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 10:10:01 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. S. K. & M. Investments, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against K M Investments, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02447

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendants

S. K. & M. Investments, Inc.

Siu Enterprises, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Mark D Potter

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Claire Cylkowski

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Joseph Karlin

L Scott Karlin

Rex T Reeves

David E Karlin

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MINUTES ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before June 24, 2022 why defendant S. K. and M. Investments, Inc. should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER DENYING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME OF DEFENDANT SIU ENTERPRISES, LLC TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint request of the parties set forth in the above-referenced Second Stipulation is hereby DENIED. re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #21 . (aco) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rex T Reeves on behalf of Defendant Siu Enterprises, LLC (Attorney Rex T Reeves added to party Siu Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Reeves, Rex) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#19

(#19) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock counsel for Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Ariel Vento is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#18

(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant S. K. & M. Investments, Inc. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paris Kyamini Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#17

(#17) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercisesupplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Siu Enterprises, LLC answer now due 6/12/2022, filed by Attorney for Defendant Siu Enterprises, LLC.(Attorney David E Karlin added to party Siu Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Karlin, David) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Claire Cylkowski on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Claire Cylkowski added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Cylkowski, Claire) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ariel Elizabeth Vento on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Ariel Elizabeth Vento added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Vento, Ariel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#2

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#1

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants S. K. & M. Investments, Inc., Siu Enterprises, LLC. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTES ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before June 24, 2022 why defendant S. K. and M. Investments, Inc. should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER DENYING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME OF DEFENDANT SIU ENTERPRISES, LLC TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint request of the parties set forth in the above-referenced Second Stipulation is hereby DENIED. re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #21 . (aco) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 7/12/2022 filed by Attorney for Defendant Siu Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reeves, Rex) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rex T Reeves on behalf of Defendant Siu Enterprises, LLC (Attorney Rex T Reeves added to party Siu Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Reeves, Rex) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock counsel for Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Ariel Vento is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant S. K. & M. Investments, Inc. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paris Kyamini Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercisesupplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Siu Enterprises, LLC answer now due 6/12/2022, filed by Attorney for Defendant Siu Enterprises, LLC.(Attorney David E Karlin added to party Siu Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Karlin, David) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Siu Enterprises, LLC served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: JIN XIAO in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandezto Order to Show Cause #13 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Price, Dennis) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants S. K. & M. Investments, Inc., Siu Enterprises, LLC. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Claire Cylkowski on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Claire Cylkowski added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Cylkowski, Claire) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ariel Elizabeth Vento on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Ariel Elizabeth Vento added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Vento, Ariel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111895 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less