This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 10:43:43 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. Juan H. Alonso et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Juan H Alonso. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02450

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendants

Juan H. Alonso

The Big Burrito, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark D Potter

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Christopher A Seabock

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sarah Anastasi

Attorney at Potter Handy

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Defaults By Clerk #15 entered on May 26, 2022, the Court sets a hearing for Order To Show Cause Re Default Judgment for July 11, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. If a Motion for Default Judgment is filed prior to this hearing, the hearing on the Order To Show Cause will be discharged, and no appearance will be necessary. (iv) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#22

(#22) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement #21 filed May 31, 2022, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for August 1, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Defaults By Clerk #18 #19 entered on May 20, 2022, the Court sets a hearing for Order To Show Cause Re Default Judgment for June 27, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. If a Motion for Default Judgment is filed prior to this hearing, the hearing on the Order To Show Cause will be discharged, and no appearance will be necessary. Any Motion for default judgment must comply with the Court's Procedures and Schedules. See http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-michael-w-fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#19

(#19) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to The Big Burrito, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#18

(#18) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Juan H. Alonso. (iv) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

17 #1

Declaration

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Juan H. Alonso served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher A Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Christopher A Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Christopher) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Juan H. Alonso, The Big Burrito, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#3

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#2

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#1

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Juan H. Alonso, The Big Burrito, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Defaults By Clerk #15 entered on May 26, 2022, the Court sets a hearing for Order To Show Cause Re Default Judgment for July 11, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. If a Motion for Default Judgment is filed prior to this hearing, the hearing on the Order To Show Cause will be discharged, and no appearance will be necessary. (iv) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement #21 filed May 31, 2022, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for August 1, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Defaults By Clerk #18 #19 entered on May 20, 2022, the Court sets a hearing for Order To Show Cause Re Default Judgment for June 27, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. If a Motion for Default Judgment is filed prior to this hearing, the hearing on the Order To Show Cause will be discharged, and no appearance will be necessary. Any Motion for default judgment must comply with the Court's Procedures and Schedules. See http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-michael-w-fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to The Big Burrito, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Juan H. Alonso. (iv) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant The Big Burrito, Inc. filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Juan H. Alonso filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Juan H. Alonso served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant The Big Burrito, Inc. served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: JUAN H ALONSO in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Anastasi on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Sarah Anastasi added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Anastasi, Sarah) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher A Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Christopher A Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Christopher) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Juan H. Alonso, The Big Burrito, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111946 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Potter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A Seabock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Lockhart Seabock