This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 09:48:41 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. Janet S. Golden et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Janet S Golden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02325

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendants

Janet S. Golden

Jeffrey A. Golden

Gregory J. Golden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tehniat Zaman

Mark D Potter

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Aaina Duggal

Christopher A Seabock

Zachary Manning Best

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey David Montez

Leslie A Bower

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33087820 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Gregory J. Golden, Janet S. Golden, Jeffrey A. Golden. (car) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#9

(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Aaina Duggal on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Aaina Duggal added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Duggal, Aaina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Zachary Manning Best on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Zachary Manning Best added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Best, Zachary) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Janet S. Golden served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Jeffrey A. Golden served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Subserved to Jane Doe. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#14

(#14) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, by no later than May 23, 2022, why defendant Janet S. Golden should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Janet S. Golden answer now due 6/13/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Janet S. Golden.(Attorney Jeffrey David Montez added to party Janet S. Golden(pty:dft))(Montez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandezto Order to Show Cause, #14 (Seabock, Christopher) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeffrey A. Golden answer now due 6/13/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jeffrey A. Golden.(Montez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeffrey A. Golden answer now due 6/13/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jeffrey A. Golden.(Montez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandezto Order to Show Cause, #14 (Seabock, Christopher) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Janet S. Golden answer now due 6/13/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Janet S. Golden.(Attorney Jeffrey David Montez added to party Janet S. Golden(pty:dft))(Montez, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, by no later than May 23, 2022, why defendant Janet S. Golden should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Jeffrey A. Golden served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Subserved to Jane Doe. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Janet S. Golden served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Zachary Manning Best on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Zachary Manning Best added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Best, Zachary) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Aaina Duggal on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Aaina Duggal added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Duggal, Aaina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Gregory J. Golden, Janet S. Golden, Jeffrey A. Golden. (car) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33087820 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less