This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 10:09:26 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. Humberto Barcena et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Humberto Barcena. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02443

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendants

Humberto Barcena

Kim Chung Lam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bradley Alan Smith

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Elliott Charles Montgomery

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark D Potter

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Jeff A Mann

Attorney at Law Office of Jeff Mann

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1428

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 11, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 27, 2022. The title page of the Joint Report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application and [Prop] order; and certificate and notice of interested parties should be efiled as separate documents. Application(s) are set on the Judge's calendar. Also, noted that the application is a state form document. See our court's website for adr forms. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

14 #3

DAL-010

14 #2

CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES

14 #1

DAL-005

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Kim Chung Lam served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LeeDoeCashier in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradley Alan Smith counsel for Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Bradley Smith is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley Alan Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Bradley Alan Smith added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Humberto Barcena, Kim Chung Lam. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111811 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 11, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 27, 2022. The title page of the Joint Report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application and [Prop] order; and certificate and notice of interested parties should be efiled as separate documents. Application(s) are set on the Judge's calendar. Also, noted that the application is a state form document. See our court's website for adr forms. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by defendant Kim Chung Lam. (Attachments: #1 DAL-005, #2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES, #3 DAL-010)(Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party Kim Chung Lam(pty:dft))(Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Kim Chung Lam served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LeeDoeCashier in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradley Alan Smith counsel for Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Bradley Smith is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley Alan Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Bradley Alan Smith added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Humberto Barcena, Kim Chung Lam. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111811 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeff A Mann