This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 10:09:12 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. Cheers Beers Market

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Cheers Beers Market. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steve Kim and Andre Birotte Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02442

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendant

Cheers Beers Market

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bradley Alan Smith

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark D Potter

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Elliott Charles Montgomery

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Jeff A Mann

Attorney at Law Office of Jeff Mann

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1428

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARITIES filed by defendant Cheers Beers Market. (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#19

(#19) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #15 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Per Local Rule 7.1-1, counsel shall immediately file the Certificate of Interested Parties. (et) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. State court stay forms included as attachments 1 and 2. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

15 #2

DAL-005 Defendant's Application for Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluati

15 #1

DAL-010 Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference, Joint In

15 #15

Main Document

14 #1

Proof of Service

14 #14

Main Document

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley Alan Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Bradley Alan Smith added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cheers Beers Market. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#2

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#1

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer filed by defendant Cheers Beers Market. (Attachments: #1 DAL-010 Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference, Joint Inspection (Cheers Beers Market), #2 DAL-005 Defendant's Application for Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference, Joint Inspecction (Cheers Beers Market))(Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party Cheers Beers Market(pty:dft))(Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARITIES filed by defendant Cheers Beers Market. (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #15 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Per Local Rule 7.1-1, counsel shall immediately file the Certificate of Interested Parties. (et) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. State court stay forms included as attachments 1 and 2. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer filed by defendant Cheers Beers Market. (Attachments: #1 DAL-010 Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference, Joint Inspection (Cheers Beers Market), #2 DAL-005 Defendant's Application for Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference, Joint Inspecction (Cheers Beers Market))(Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party Cheers Beers Market(pty:dft))(Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Cheers Beers Market served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for service of process: VICTOR KHALIL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (pg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (pg) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley Alan Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Bradley Alan Smith added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Smith, Bradley) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cheers Beers Market. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111766 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeff A Mann